This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 13:03:57 (UTC).

RANDALL RADFORD VS. BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2009 RANDALL RADFORD filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PETER J. BUSCH, CYNTHIA M. LEE, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD, CURTIS KARNOW, MARY E. WISS, ARLENE T. BORICK, EVERETT HEWLETT, RICHARD B. ULMER, JOHN K. STEWART, PAUL H. ALVARADO, MARLA J. MILLER and MONICA F. WILEY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8061

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

PETER J. BUSCH

CYNTHIA M. LEE

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD

CURTIS KARNOW

MARY E. WISS

ARLENE T. BORICK

EVERETT HEWLETT

RICHARD B. ULMER

JOHN K. STEWART

PAUL H. ALVARADO

MARLA J. MILLER

MONICA F. WILEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

RADFORD, RANDALL

Defendants, Respondents and Others

VANDERSPEK, HUGH

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC.

Others and Respondents

THE INSURANCE COPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA

VANDERSPEK, HUGH

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

FARRISE, SIMONA A

Attorney at THE FARRISE LAW FIRM, P.C.

225 S. Olive, Ste. 102

Los Angeles, CA 90012

ARKIN, SHARON J.

Attorney at THE ARKIN LAW FIRM

225 S. Olive St, Ste 102

Los Angeles, CA 90012

LIBERTY, MICHA STAR

Attorney at LIBERTY LAW OFFICES

1970 Broadway, Ste. 700

Oakland, CA 94612

MINNARD, CARLA V

Attorney at THE FARRISE LAW FIRM, P.C.

901 Clay St.

Oakland, CA 94607

YANDLE, STACI M.

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF STACI M. YANDLE, LLC

One Eagle Center, Suite 3-A

O'Fallon, IL 62269

SHER, MALCOLM

Attorney at SHER MINNARD LLP

1850 Mt. Diablo Blvd., Ste 610

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant, Respondent and Other Attorneys

JONES, TYREE PRESTON

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

101 Second St, Ste 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

KAPPELMAN, LYNN A

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLPWORLD TRADE CENTER EAST

Two Seaport Lane, Ste 300

Boston, MA 02210

MILLER, MICHELE BALLARD

Attorney at MILLER LAW GROUP, P.C.

111 Sutter Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94104

NEWLAND, GEORGE DANIEL

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

560 Mission St, Ste 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF RADFORD, RANDALL TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT VANDERSPEK, HUGH SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE ANY COSTS ENTERED ON JUDGMENT AND ALLOWING PLTF TIME TO RESPOND, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, AN OST ON A MO TO SET ASIDE ANY COSTS ENTERED ON JUDGMENT AND ALLOWING PLTF TIME TO RESPOND; MEMO OF P&A IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADFORD, RANDALL (Fee:60.00)

ORDER

ORDER DENYING DEFANDANDT BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC'S PARTIAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT ON PUNITIVE DAMAGES

JUDGMENT AFTER JURY TRIAL

JUDGMENT AFTER JURY TRIAL

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING AMENDED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF RADFORD, RANDALL TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT VANDERSPEK, HUGH ON THE COMPLAINT, SAID DEFENDANT TO HAVE JUDGMENT THEREON FOR $3,510.10 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,510.10, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC.

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC. AND HUGH VANDERSPEK'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADFORD, RANDALL AS TO DEFENDANT BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC. VANDERSPEK, HUGH DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-02-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-06-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-17-2009 (Fee:365.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADFORD, RANDALL SERVED MAY-26-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VANDERSPEK, HUGH

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC. VANDERSPEK, HUGH (Fee:730.00)

STIPULATION

STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE DEMURRER/MOTIN TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER FILED BY RADFORD, RANDALL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADFORD, RANDALL SERVED MAY-15-2009, MAIL ON DEFENDANT BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC.

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR MAR-10-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY-28-2010 AT 2:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 504. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-14-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-02-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-16-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-30-2010 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 505. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER -PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. TWO

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS

153 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketPayment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1614527R024

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1614527M023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2214515M020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • DocketPayment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2214514S022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketPayment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1714506R013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1714506M012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W1614430M004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • DocketPayment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1614422J013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketPayment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2014218R023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2014218M022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
835 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND AWARD OF SANCTIONS, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC. VANDERSPEK, HUGH HEARING SET FOR SEP-25-2009 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 612 (Fee:$40.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADFORD, RANDALL SERVED MAY-15-2009, MAIL ON DEFENDANT BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC. VANDERSPEK, HUGH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE DEMURRER/MOTIN TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER FILED BY RADFORD, RANDALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • DocketFEE PAID FOR STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR PLTF. TO FILE DEFMURRER/MOTION TO STRIKE DEFTS' ANSWER; AND DEFTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADFORD, RANDALL (Fee:$20.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC. VANDERSPEK, HUGH (Fee:$730.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • DocketASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS: FARRISE, SIMONA A ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR RADFORD, RANDALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADFORD, RANDALL SERVED MAY-26-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VANDERSPEK, HUGH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADFORD, RANDALL AS TO DEFENDANT BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC. VANDERSPEK, HUGH DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-02-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-06-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-17-2009 (Fee:$365.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******8061
Case Title:RANDALL RADFORD VS. BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR, INC. et al
Court Date:NOV-14-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Tax Costs Requested By Bae Systems Sf Ship Repair, Inc
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Thursday, November 14, 2013, Line 1: Plaintiff RANDALL RADFORD'S Motion To Tax Costs Requested By Bae Systems Sf Ship Repair, Inc.Off calendar per stipulation and order on November 6, 2013. =302/MJM


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAE SYSTEMS SAN FRANCISCO SHIP REPAIR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES, TYREE P., Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEWLAND, GEORGE DANIEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER MICHELE BALLARD