Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 20:13:16 (UTC).

RAMEE HERWITZ VS. ANDREW ROBERTS

Case Summary

On 06/11/2014 RAMEE HERWITZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ANDREW ROBERTS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1732

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERWITZ, RAMEE

San Francisco, CA 94107

Respondent

ROBERTS, ANDREW

San Francisco, CA 94131

Minors

ROBERTS, KAI

ROBERTS, BRODIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS DEC-21-2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • JUDGMENT REVIEWED BY DEFAULT CLERK AND SENT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT ROBERTS, ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER HERWITZ, RAMEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • PRELIMINARY FINAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT ROBERTS, ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • PRELIMINARY FINAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER HERWITZ, RAMEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT ROBERTS, ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED SUBMITTED BY: PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: JUN-17-2014, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE: JUN-20-2014 FILED BY PETITIONER HERWITZ, RAMEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • NOTICE OF NATURE OF AVAILABILITY OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION METHODS IN FAMILY LAW MATTERS FILED BY PETITIONER HERWITZ, RAMEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER HERWITZ, RAMEE AS TO RESPONDENT ROBERTS, ANDREW SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less