This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:26:02 (UTC).

RALPH LIAL VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2007 RALPH LIAL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4385

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIAL, RALPH

Defendants

TRANE US INC. FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

CHRYSLER LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY, LLC

GRINNELL LLC

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.

DOES 1-8500

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

ADVOCATE MINES, LTD.

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO.

WESTBURNE SUPPLY, INC.

COLTEC INDUSTRIES INC.

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

COWPERTHWAITE, JOHN GRAHAM

Attorney at BENNETT, SAMUELSEN, REYNOLDS & ALLARD, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1301 Marina Village Parkway, Ste 300

Alameda, CA 94501

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

HARTWELL, MORTIMER H

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

Attorney at MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

FONG, CAMILLE KAMEE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Samsone Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

BRUNI, CHRISTOPHE B.

Attorney at SINUNU BRUNI,LLP

333 Pine Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Lial Dismissal as to Special Electric

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20257902) AS TO DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20254437) AS TO DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

Notice of Law Firm Name Change

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 18569755) FILED BY ATTORNEY LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31667078) AS TO DEFENDANT ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.

Defendant Chrysler LLCs Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17470321) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHRYSLER LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY, LLC (Fee:335.00)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 17519843) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL w/ prej as to complt as to deft j.t. thorpe & son, inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32308908) AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (RAPID)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27617599) AS TO DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20791410) AS TO DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014. DISMISSAL FILED 10/21/14. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56227807)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketTIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO MAR-12-2016 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIAL, RALPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-13-2012 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR THE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO THE ONLY REMAINING DEFENDANT, PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37078386) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-16-2010 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 206 FOR STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER DIANA L. GONZALEZ, CSR #7935, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL, BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17424384) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17406820) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17334033) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17317551) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17132195) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAL-STEAM SUPPLY COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17088902) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17052314) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIAL, RALPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIAL, RALPH AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ITT INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PLANT INSULATION, LLC, DBA/AKA PLANT INSULATION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant