Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 07:46:53 (UTC).

RAIF B. DENKTAS VS. ROXUL, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2011 RAIF B DENKTAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ROXUL, LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3696

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENKTAS, RAIF B.

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

LUXOR CABS, INC.

ROXUL, LLC

LUXOR TAXI COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROGERS, RICHARD MARTIN

NICOLETTO, JENNIFER

345 Franklin St

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorney

WARD, PHILIP S

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DENKTAS, RAIF B. TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR TAXI COMPANY LUXOR CABS, INC. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DENKTAS, RAIF B. AS TO DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR TAXI COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-27-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-25-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-12-2012 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC. HEARING SET FOR JAN-19-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY PRO PER

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC.

ORDER

ORDER RE DISCOVERY MOTION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE: DISCOVERY MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC.

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

AMENDED NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS (ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION); REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLTFFS RAIF DENKTAS FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC. HEARING SET FOR SEP-20-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF JOANNA L. STOREY IN SUPP OF MTN FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE: MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DENKTAS, RAIF B. (Fee:60.00)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DENKTAS, RAIF B. (Fee:60.00)

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-25-2013 VACATED. JUDGMENT FILED ON 12/19/12. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $3,016.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE JAN-18-2013, FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • DISCOVERY 302, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: TERMINATING SANCTIONS - THE MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS IS GRANTED ON THE CONDITION THAT, AT HEARING, DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL PROVIDES PROOF (E.G., A FEDEX SHIPPING LABEL OR OTHER SUCH DOCUMENTATION) THAT THE NOTICE OF NEW HEARING AND ASSOCIATED PAPERS WERE IN FACT SERVED ON PLAINTIFF AT HIS LAST KNOWN ADDRESS ON DECEMBER 7, 2012, AND THAT THE LAS VEGAS ADDRESS INDICATED IN THE PROOF OF SERVICE IS IN FACT PLAINTIFF'S LAST KNOWN ADDRESS. PROVIDED THAT THOSE CONDITIONS ARE MET, PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, WITH DEFENDANTS TO RECOVER COSTS, AND THE COURT WILL ENTER A SEPARATE JUDGMENT ACCORDINGLY IN A FORM TO BE PREPARED BY DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL. ORDER AND JUDGMENT SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. PRO TEM JUDGE: JIM WEIXEL, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT, NOT REPORTED. =302/JPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-19-2012 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DENKTAS, RAIF B. TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR TAXI COMPANY LUXOR CABS, INC. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ISSUING TERMINATING SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: TERMINATING SANCTIONS HEARING SET FOR DEC-19-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-20-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-27-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT THAT NO OPPOSITION WAS FILED RE MO TO COMPEL PLTF'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; REQ FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC. HEARING SET FOR JAN-19-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR CABS, INC. (Fee:820.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR ROGERS, RICHARD MARTIN AS ATTORNEY FOR DENKTAS, RAIF B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DENKTAS, RAIF B. SERVED AUG-30-2011, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE SEP-26-2011 ON DEFENDANT LUXOR TAXI COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DENKTAS, RAIF B. AS TO DEFENDANT ROXUL, LLC LUXOR TAXI COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-27-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-25-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-12-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LUXOR CABS, INC., DBA LUXOR CAB COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ward, Philip S.