This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 05:08:49 (UTC).

RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA VS. BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. A CALIFORNIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/23/2016 RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC A CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARY E. WISS, TERI L. JACKSON, PANG LY and JOHN K. STEWART. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1093

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

MARY E. WISS

TERI L. JACKSON

PANG LY

JOHN K. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION ON BEHALF IOF ITSELF, AND IN ITS REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS

Cross Defendants and Defendants

BAYSIDE TILE & STONE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 300 INCLUSIVE

HIGHTOWER FINISHING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NORTH BAY OVERHEAD DOORS, INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OAKMONT INDUSTRIES, LTD. A CANADIAN LIMITED COMPANY

HIGHRISE MECHANICAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

VALLEY CREST LANDSCAPE, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STARLINE WINDOWS, INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PETER ROSS CA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

B&C PAINTING & DECORATING

MOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

ROES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

SOUTHLAND ELECTRIC, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EAST & WEST ALUM CRAFT, LTD, A CANADIAN LIMITED COMPANY

JERRY THOMPSON & SONS PAINTING, INC., A CALIFORNIA JOINT VENTURE

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STARLINE WINDOWS, INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SOUTHLAND ELECTRIC, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTTINGHAUS, DANIEL LOUIS

Attorney at BERDING & WEIL LLP

2175 North California Blvd, Ste 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

EARL, TIMOTHY C

Attorney at SULLIVAN,HILL, LEWIN, REZ & ENGEL

600 B Street, 17Th Street

San Diego, CA 92101

OSIER, ROBERT M

Attorney at ROGERS JOSEPH O'DONNELL

311 California Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

BULGER, JAY

Attorney at KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON HALUCK, LLP

225 Broadway 21St Flr

San Diego, CA 92101

CARLSON, ROBERT C.

Attorney at KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK, LLP

225 Broadway,, 21St Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

AMUNDSON, STEVEN G.

Attorney at WHITE & AMUNDSON, APC

402 W. Broadway, Suite 1140

San Diego, CA 92101

ANDERSON, DEVON M. THURTLE

Attorney at HEFFERNAN LAW GROUP PLLC

1201 Market St

Kirkland, WA 98033

HINTON, LONI L

Attorney at HEFFERNAN LAW GROUP PLLC

1201 Market Street

Kirkland, WA 98033

RESURRECCION, TREVOR O.

Attorney at LYNBERG & WATKINS, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1100 Town & Country Road,, Suite 1450

Orange, CA 92868

FLAHERTY, JAMES H

Attorney at FLAHERTY & FLAHERTY

402 West Broadway, Suite 800

San Diego, CA 921018506

Other Attorneys

SABAITIS, FRANK THOMAS

Attorney at SABAITIS LUNSFORD & MOORE

200 S. Los Robles Ave., Suite 410

Pasadena, CA 91101

LAFLEUR, FRANK M.

Attorney at MANNING & KASS, ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTER LLP

121 Spear St., Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94105

BOURNAZIAN, J. DAVID

Attorney at TROUTMAN SANDERS

5 Park Plaza, 14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

SHAMBAUGH, CYNTHIA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS J. BURNS

525 Market Street, Suite 2850

San Francisco, CA 94105

BOZE, JOHN L

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOHN L. BOZE

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 1850

Sacramento, CA 95814

BERN, MARTIN D

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP

560 Mission Street, Twenty-Seventh Flr

San Francisco, CA 94105

NUNEZ, ELIZABETH A.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY R. WAGNER

1655 Grant Street, Suite 800-B

Concord, CA 94520

COSSO, DENNIS G

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS G. COSSO

414 South First Avenue

Arcadia, CA 91006

MACDONALD, MATTHEW ALEXANDER

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Fiftieth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 900713426

HEDGER, JOHN C.

Attorney at ERICKSON ARBUTHNOT

100 Bush Street, Suite 900

San Francisco, CA 94104

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64155291) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64115525) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED PERMITTING FILING OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA'S COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTIONAS TO BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. AND BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC'S CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60904258) (TRANSACTION ID # 60904258) FILED BY INTERVENOR THE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA ON BEHALF OF HIGHRISE MECHANICAL, A SUSPENDED CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER CONTINUING JUNE 19, 2019 HEARING ON BOSA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #63384329)

ACCO Engineered Systems, Inc. Notice of Settlement and Application for

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63322801) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC.

Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Cross-Com

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT / NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63277733) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR JUN-12-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 305

ORDER

ORDER AFTER APRIL 18, 2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [**E-SERVICE TRANSACTION I.D: 61935897**]

Notice of Association of Counsel

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 61853161) : WASINDA, JOHN J. ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR BAYSIDE TILE & STONE, INC.

DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA SHAMBAUGH IN SUPPORT OF EAST AND WEST ALUM CRAF

DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA SHAMBAUGH IN SUPPORT OF EAST AND WEST ALUM CRAFT LTDS APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND ORDER DISMISSING AND BARRING CROSS COMPLAINTS (TRANSACTION ID # 60993678) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT EAST & WEST ALUM CRAFT, LTD.

Bosa Supplemental Declaration re Meiswinkel Application re Service via

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BOSA RE MEISWINKEL APPLICATION RE SERVICE VIA SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 60934576) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60874213) FILED BY DEFENDANT STARLINE WINDOWS, INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

Declaration of Marilyn Ciborski in Support of Application for Determin

DECLARATION OF MARILYN CIBORSKI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY CROSS-DEFENDANT SOUTHLAND ELECTRIC, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 60873803) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SOUTHLAND ELECTRIC, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Akzo Nobel Coatings Inc.s Answer To Cross-Complaint By Starline Window

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60553182) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT AKZO NOBEL COATINGS INC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 60445970): LUNSFORD, BRET A. SUBSTITUTED FOR SABAITIS, FRANK THOMAS AS ATTORNEY FOR VALLEYCREST LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT INC ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED HEREIN AS VALLEY CREST LANDSCAPE INC VALLEYCREST LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT INC ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED HEREIN AS VALLEY CREST LANDSCAPE INC VALLEYCREST LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED HEREIN AS VALLEY CREST LANDSCAPE, INC.

Notice (other)

NOTICE OF CHANGE IN HANDLING ATTORNEY (TRANSACTION ID # 100008231) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT OAKMONT INDUSTRIES, LTD.

DEFENDANT OAKMONT INDUSTRIES, LTDS ANSWER TO BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORN

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 59540764) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT OAKMONT INDUSTRIES, LTD.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16235064) FILED BY DEFENDANT BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Proof of Service of Summons (as to Bosa Development California, Inc.)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58858054), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION ON BEHALF IOF ITSELF, AND IN ITS REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-28-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

358 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 65571970)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • HearingMatter(s): Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal Off Calendar Dec-05-2019 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 613; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCOMPLEX LITIGATION, DEPT. 613, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON DEC-16-2019 IN DEPT. 613, COMPLEX LITIGATION IS VACATED PURSUANT TO COMPLIANCE WITH DEC-04-2019 ORDER (613/TLJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. A CALIFORNIA, BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA / DISMISSAL OF ALL CROSS COMPLAINTS AND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINTS FILED BY BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. AND BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 64488975)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID #64488982)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT; AUTHORIZATION TO REASSIGN CASES AND PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID #64477058)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF BOSA'S CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64210526) AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT STARLINE WINDOWS, INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANS# 64188928)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL HEARING SET FOR DEC-16-2019 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 613

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • HearingMatter(s): MOTION FOR LEAVE TO File 2nd Amended Cross-Complaint \/ Notice Of Motion & Motion For Leave To File 2nd Amended Cross-Complaint Off Calendar Sep-04-2019 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 613; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
491 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58858243), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION ON BEHALF IOF ITSELF, AND IN ITS REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-28-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT STARLINE WINDOWS, INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58858054), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION ON BEHALF IOF ITSELF, AND IN ITS REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-28-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58858054), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION ON BEHALF IOF ITSELF, AND IN ITS REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-28-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58858054), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION ON BEHALF IOF ITSELF, AND IN ITS REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-28-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT VALLEY CREST LANDSCAPE, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58858054), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION ON BEHALF IOF ITSELF, AND IN ITS REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-28-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58858054), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION ON BEHALF IOF ITSELF, AND IN ITS REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-28-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT BAYSIDE TILE & STONE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58858054), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION ON BEHALF IOF ITSELF, AND IN ITS REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED MAR-29-2016, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT NORTH BAY OVERHEAD DOORS, INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0816323F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RADIANCE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION ON BEHALF IOF ITSELF, AND IN ITS REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS AS TO DEFENDANT BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA II, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BOSA DEVELOPMENT CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BAYSIDE TILE & STONE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HIGHRISE MECHANICAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HIGHTOWER FINISHING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION NORTH BAY OVERHEAD DOORS, INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION OAKMONT INDUSTRIES, LTD. A CANADIAN LIMITED COMPANY STARLINE WINDOWS, INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION VALLEY CREST LANDSCAPE, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 300 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-24-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-23-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-01-2016 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAST & WEST GOURMET FOOD INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HIGHTOWER FINISHING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHLAND ELECTRIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PETER ROSS CA INC; ESA : PETER ROSS LTD is a litigant