This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 17:41:50 (UTC).

QUINCY YU et al VS. JEFFREY YU et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 QUINCY YU filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JEFFREY YU. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4187

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YU, QUINCY

YU, KAY

Defendants

YU, JEFFREY

San Francisco, CA 94123

DOES 1 TO 10

San Francisco, CA 94123

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHIVO, RONALD DAVID

Attorney at UTRECHT HARDING & LENVIN, LLP

109 Stevenson St, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorney

HASTINGS, JAMES RAYMOND

Attorney at J.R. HASTINGS LAW CORP

1003 Third Street

San Rafael, CA 94901

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY SERVED FEB-01-2013, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY SERVED FEB-01-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY

NOTICE

NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPP OF OPPOS TO MTN TO COMPEL DEFT TO RESPOND TO WRITTEN DISCO FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

MEMO IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO VACATE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOS TO DEFTS MOTION TO VACATE VOLUNTARY DIMSISSAL AND ENTER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ORDERING THAT DEFT IS THE PREVAILING PARTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS SERVED BY DEFT AFTER CASE WAS DISMISSED; AND FOR AN AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY HEARING SET FOR MAY-29-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOITCE OF/AND AMENDED DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMO OF P & A IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; PROPOSED ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY SERVED APR-08-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO COMPEL DEFT TO ALLOW INSPECTION OF REAL PROPERTY; AND FOR AN AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY HEARING SET FOR APR-29-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

REPLY

REPLY MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MOTON TO COMPEL DEFTS TO ALLOW INSPECTION OF REAL PROPERTY, AND FOR AN AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY HEARING SET FOR FEB-26-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:IFP)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE: ORDER DENYING DEFNT'S MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE: ORDER DENYING DEFNT'S MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND ENTER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDGICE ORDERING THAT DEFENDANT IS THE PREVAILING PARTY AND AWARDING DEFENDANT COSTS INCLUDING ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, DEFENDANT JEFFREY YU'S MOTION TO VACATE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND ENTER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ORDERING THAT DEFENDANT IS THE PREVAILING PARTY AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES IS DENIED, MOVING PARTY FAILS TO CITE ANY AUTHORITY FOR THE PROPOSITION THAT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL SHOULD BE VACATED. DEFENDANT IS AWARDED COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $652.90. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE RONALD E. QUIDACHAY, CLERK K. LIU, CSR MILES LENDWAY AND CSR MARY DUTRA (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-20-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOS TO DEFTS MOTION TO VACATE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NANCY C. LENVIN IN OPPOS TO DEFTS MOTION TO VACATE VOLUNSTARY DISMISSAL AND ENTER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ORDERING THAT DEFT IS THE PREVAILING PARTY AND AWARDING DEFT COSTS INCLUDING ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS SERVED BY DEFENDANT AFTER CASE WAS DISMISSED FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, DEFENDANT JEFFREY YU'S MOTION TO VACATE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND ENTER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ORDERING THAT DEFT IS THE PREVAILING PARTY AND AWARDING DEFT COSTS INCLUDING ATTORNEYS FEES IS DENIED, UNTIMELY PER CCP 1005. PREVAILING PARTY PREPARE ORDER. JUDGE RONALD E QUIDACHAY, CLERK K. LIU, NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-04-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS SERVED BY DEFENDANT AFTER CASE WAS DISMISSED AND FOR AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY AS TO DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY SERVED FEB-01-2013, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY SERVED FEB-01-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY AS TO DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY HEARING SET FOR FEB-26-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YU, QUINCY YU, KAY AS TO DEFENDANT YU, JEFFREY DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less