This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 03:33:28 (UTC).

QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPOR VS. STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERP et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2012 QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPOR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERP. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7826

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADREANI, MICHAEL B.

Attorney at ROXBOROUGH, POMERANCE, NYE & ADREANI LLP

5820 Canoga Avenue, Suite 250

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

LONG, GREGORY A

Attorney at SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

333 South Hope Street, 43Rd Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT TRANSFERRED FROM VENTURA COUNTY (FILED JULY 22, 2011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-06-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-21-2012 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

REGISTER OF ACTIONS - TRANSFERRED FROM VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT -

REGISTER OF ACTIONS - TRANSFERRED FROM VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT - FILINGS FROM JULY 22, 2011 THROUGH JANUARY 18, 2012 - SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS

NOTICE

NOTICE OF FILING AND TRANSMITTAL (TRANSFERRED FROM VENTURA COUNTY - CASE NO. 56-2011-00400846-CU-BC-VTA)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS OF ADR PACKAGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NOTICE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY DEFENDANT STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE

RESPONSE

RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO NTC OF RELATED CASE; DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OFM OTION TO STRIKE REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; MEMO OF P&A FILED BY DEFENDANT STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE HEARING SET FOR APR-03-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STIPULATION AND ORDER STRIKING PLTF'S REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-22-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-06-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY HEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND RESPONSE TO OBJECTION OF STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-04-2013 VACATED. DISMISSAL FILED 7/5/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-03-2013 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON NOV-04-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PURSUANT TO EX PARTE ORDER FILED ON 2/13/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - EX PARTE ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DEADLINE DATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO COTNINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINE DATES FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-03-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • OBJECTION HEARING JUL-11-2012 (610)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR OBJECTION HEARING HEARING SET FOR JUL-11-2012 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND RESPONSE TO OBJECTION OF STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OFM OTION TO STRIKE REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES; MEMO OF P&A FILED BY DEFENDANT STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE HEARING SET FOR APR-03-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO NTC OF RELATED CASE; DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY DEFENDANT STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • POS OF ADR PACKAGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING AND TRANSMITTAL (TRANSFERRED FROM VENTURA COUNTY - CASE NO. 56-2011-00400846-CU-BC-VTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REGISTER OF ACTIONS - TRANSFERRED FROM VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT - FILINGS FROM JULY 22, 2011 THROUGH JANUARY 18, 2012 - SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • FILING FEES OF $410 PAID BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT TRANSFERRED FROM VENTURA COUNTY (FILED JULY 22, 2011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF QUEST STAFFING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-06-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-21-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUEST STAFFING SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant