This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 09:31:45 (UTC).

PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/26/2014 PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4060

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION

Respondents

BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOES 1 TO 5

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ("CITY"), ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND THE BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ("BOARD OF SUPERVISORS")

Interested Parties

KIRKHAM, TRACY

DOES 6 TO 10

COOPER, JOE

RICKS, JEREMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRANDT-HAWLEY, SUSAN LYNNE

Attorney at BRANDT- HAWLEY LAW GROUP

P.O. Box 1659

Glen Ellen, CA 95442

Respondent Attorney

WONG, VICTORIA

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEYSCITY HALL, ROOM 234

1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Pl

San Francisco, CA 94102

Interested Party Attorney

FRATTIN, DANIEL

Attorney at REUBEN, JENIUS & ROSE, LLP

1 Bush Street, Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION

PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15011099) FILED BY PETITIONER PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION

MINUTES FOR MAR-26-2015 2:30 PM

MINUTES FOR MAR-26-2015 2:30 PM

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56912998) FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 HOURS

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58305112) FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Election to Prepare Record of Proceedings

ELECTION TO PREPARE RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 14362006) FILED BY PETITIONER PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION FILED BY PETITIONER PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION AS TO RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 5 JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:450.00)

Reply brief in support of petition for writ of mandamus

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (TRANSACTION ID # 100007789) FILED BY PETITIONER PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION

Joinder in Case Management Statement

JOINDER IN CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15075140) FILED BY PETITIONER PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION

Notice of Lodging of Joint Excerpts Of Administrative Record

NOTICE OF LODGING OF JOINT EXCERPTS OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (TRANSACTION ID # 58130883) FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JAN-21-2016 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 503

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR JAN-21-2016 2:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketTRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON JAN-21-2016 IN 503, HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS - AT THE CONCLUSION OF THE HEARING, THE COURT TOOK THE MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION. EACH SIDE SUBMITTED A PROPOSED ORDER FOR THE COURT'S CONSIDERATION. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; REPORTER: RHONDA R. HARRIS, CSR #7414. SUBMITTED ON JAN-21-2016 BY TERI L. JACKSON.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketERRATA TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (TRANSACTION ID # 58451147) FILED BY PETITIONER PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketTRIAL MOTION IN DEPT. 503, HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS IS CONTINUED ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION TO JANUARY 21, 2016 AT 2:00 P.M. IN DEPARTMENT 503, HON. TERI L. JACKSON PRESIDING. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON, MATTER NOT REPORTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JAN-07-2016 01:30 PM FOR DEPT 503

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (TRANSACTION ID # 58304948) FILED BY PETITIONER PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58305112) FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING SAN FRANCISCO PLANNING CODE SECTION 101.1(B) PRIORITY POLICIES (TRANSACTION ID # 58305112) FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING SAN FRANCISCO PLANNING CODE SECTION 101.1(B) PRIORITY POLICIES (TRANSACTION ID # 58305112) FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-17-2015 CONTINUED TO MAR-26-2015 AT 2:30 PM IN DEPT. 503, ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION AND UPON AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT MEETING (TRANSACTION ID # 56777355) FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT MEETING (TRANSACTION ID # 56734133) FILED BY RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF HEARING SET FOR MAR-17-2015 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 503

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (RE: ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S CHALLENGE TO HON. TERI L. JACKSON PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 170.6)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S CHALLENGE TO HON. TERI L. JACKSON PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 170.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15011099) FILED BY PETITIONER PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 15004021) FILED BY PETITIONER PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTION TO PREPARE RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 14362006) FILED BY PETITIONER PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION FILED BY PETITIONER PROTECT TELEGRAPH HILL, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIA TION AS TO RESPONDENT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 5 JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less