This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/09/2020 at 07:19:40 (UTC).

PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC. VS. FEEVA TECHNOLOGY, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2010 PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against FEEVA TECHNOLOGY, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PETER J. BUSCH, TOMAR MASON, EVERETT HEWLETT, RICHARD B. ULMER and JAMES J. MCBRIDE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3609

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

PETER J. BUSCH

TOMAR MASON

EVERETT HEWLETT

RICHARD B. ULMER

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC.

Defendant

FEEVA TECHNOLOGY, INC.

500 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

601 S. Figueroa St.

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LONG, HERMAN CLYDE

Attorney at LONG LAW OFFICES

950 Risa Road, 2Nd Floor

Lafayette, CA 94549

Defendant Attorney

SAFFOURI, HUSSEIN M

Attorney at RAMSEY LAW GROUP

250 Lafayette Circle, Ste 107

Lafayette, CA 94549

 

Court Documents

COURT JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FEEVA TECHNOLOGY, INC. THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 500 HOWARD STREET, SUITE 425, SF 94105 $601,483.73 RENT, $20,000.00 ATTORNEY FEES, TOTAL JUDGMENT $621,483.73, SEE SCANNED DOC

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SET FOR 11/4/10 AT 9:30 A.M. IN DEPT. 301; OPPOSITION DUE 11/2; WRITTEN REPLY IS WAIVED)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL

COUNTER REQUEST TO SET FOR TRIAL

COUNTER REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT FEEVA TECHNOLOGY, INC. COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-09-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL: 4.0 HOURS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL

REQUEST TO SET FOR TRIAL

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC. COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-09-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FEEVA TECHNOLOGY, INC. (Fee:370.00)

ORDER

ORDER FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (RESIDENT)

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT FEEVA TECHNOLOGY, INC. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:370.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2011
  • FinancialPayment : ORDER OF EXAMINATION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W2111A24O016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • FinancialPayment : ORDER OF EXAMINATION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W2010B04O012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • FinancialPayment : WRIT ISSUED; Amount : $25; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W2010B04W011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1610A27M022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W3610A27M005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R1610A25M017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R1610A21M008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $370; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W2010720F017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • FinancialPayment : WRIT ISSUED; Amount : $25; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W3610712W009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • FinancialPayment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W3610630E013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2010
  • DocketBOND #1000828747 IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,000.00 FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC. EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • DocketDISCOVERY 612, AFTER HEARING, PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT IS GRANTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $104,146.83. UNDERTAKING IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,000.00. COMMISSIONER EVERETT A. HEWLETT, JR. NOT REPORTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • DocketMINI-MINUTES FOR JUL-02-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 612

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (RESIDENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • DocketDECLARATION OF H. CLYDE LONG RE NTC OF EXPARTE HEARING FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT HEARING SET FOR JUL-02-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 612

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • DocketDECLARATION OF H. CLYDE LONG IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC. (Fee:$40.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROSODIE INTERACTIVE FLORIDA, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT FEEVA TECHNOLOGY, INC. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:$370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANTONE FLORIDA INC., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Feeva Technology, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG, H CLYDE