Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/25/2019 at 03:28:11 (UTC).

PROLIEN SERVICES LLC VS. EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 PROLIEN SERVICES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HARRY DORFMAN and CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8444

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HARRY DORFMAN

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROLIEN SERVICES LLC

Defendants

EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHREIBER, JEFFREY D

1011 Camino Del Rio South, Suite 530

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $500.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $500.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $500.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 CONTINUED TO NOV-13-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF TROY LAUGHLIN IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-13-2013 CONTINUED TO MAR-12-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC SERVED MAR-28-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. $26,245.29 PRINCIPAL, $4,373.98 INTEREST, $500.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $31,119.27, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $500.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-12-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

Invalid Check Notice

INVALID/RETURNED CHECK FOR TRANSACTION W1213204F003 FOR CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2014
  • Payment : ORDER OF EXAMINATION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2214501O005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Payment : REDEMPTION OF BAD CHECK CCP 411.20(G); Amount : $476.25; Payment Type : MONEY ORDER; Receipt Number : R8213402M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1213204F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION JUN-04-2014 DISCHARGED WITHOUT COSTS PER LOCAL RULE 8.9 (E) AS TO DEFENDANT SOHEIL NAZARI. NO APPEARANCE NOR PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. OEX HEARING SET FOR JUN-04-2014 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-12-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. $26,245.29 PRINCIPAL, $4,373.98 INTEREST, $500.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $31,119.27, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JEFFREY D. SCHREIBER RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $500.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $500.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC SERVED MAR-28-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • INVALID/RETURNED CHECK REDEEMED FOR TRANSACTION W1213204F003 FOR CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER (Fee:$476.25)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • INVALID/RETURNED CHECK FOR TRANSACTION W1213204F003 FOR CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT EYE ON YOUR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less