This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/17/2023 at 01:10:28 (UTC).

PRISCILIA CHAPMAN VS. TAN LAM ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 PRISCILIA CHAPMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TAN LAM. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO and SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2975

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAPMAN, PRISCILIA

Defendants

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOES I THROUGH X, INCLUSIVE

LAM, TAN

SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREKHUS, MATTHEW DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100183396) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAPMAN, PRISCILIA AS TO DEFENDANT LAM, TAN CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY DOES I THROUGH X, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-03-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-27-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-10-2023

Civil Case Cover Sheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100183396) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAPMAN, PRISCILIA

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100183396) TO PLAINTIFF CHAPMAN, PRISCILIA

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF CHAPMAN, PRISCILIA

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-03-2023 CONTINUED TO JUL-05-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-15-2023 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JUL-05-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100209366)

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-15-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Aug-15-2023 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-15-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100209366)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jun-12-2023 Set For Order To Show Cause On Aug-15-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-15-2023 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JUL-05-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Apr-10-2023 Continued To Jul-05-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-03-2023 CONTINUED TO JUL-05-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100183396) TO PLAINTIFF CHAPMAN, PRISCILIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type: IFP; Receipt Number: W1122B29F002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100183396) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAPMAN, PRISCILIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketREQUEST PENDING TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (SEALED DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAPMAN, PRISCILIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100183396) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHAPMAN, PRISCILIA AS TO DEFENDANT LAM, TAN CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY DOES I THROUGH X, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-03-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-27-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-10-2023; Fee: IFP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF CHAPMAN, PRISCILIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less