This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 05:42:09 (UTC).

PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION VS. PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2009 PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4833

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

PORTSIDE MASTER OWNERS' ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Claimants

SF OAKLAND BAY, LLC

EMERALD FUND, INC.

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

HUM BABY ASSOCIATES

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, OR INTEREST IN THE SUBJECT PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE TO THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREDERICK, KEVIN DEAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN D. FREDERICK

605 Middlefield Road

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant and Claimant Attorneys

HULCHIY, NICHOLAS PETER

Attorney at BELZER HULCHIY & MURRAY

3650 Mt Diablo Blvd #130

Lafayette, CA 94549

EDWARDS, CORIE A

Attorney at VOGL MEREDITH BURKE LLP

456 Montgomery St 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

JEFFREY, NUSSBAUM

Attorney at NUSSBAUM & ZIGLER LLP

150 Spear Street, Suite 1600

San Francisco, CA 94105

ZELL, DENNIS SCOTT

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC SEE SCANNED "JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AS TO PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC"

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT HUM BABY ASSOCIATES EMERALD FUND, INC. SEE SCANNED "JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL"

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-17-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING AMENDED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON THE COMPLAINT, SAID DEFENDANT TO HAVE JUDGMENT THEREON FOR $32,481.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $32,481.00, (INCLUDING $31,951 IN ATTY'S FEE AND $530.00 IN COSTS). AMENDED JUDGMENT ENTERED NUNC-PRO TUNC AS OF JUNE 2, 2010. (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION SERVED JAN-02-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-30-2010 CONTINUED TO JUN-18-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER AFTER HEARING RE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC) (SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND)

NOTICE OF APPEAL/REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT

NOTICE OF APPEAL/REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT (NTC OF APPEAL ONLY) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION (Fee:100.00)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-30-2010 CONTINUED TO SEP-17-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR STATUS OF APPEAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER AFTER HEARING RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

AMENDED APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

AMENDED APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL

REMITTITUR

REMITTITUR REVERSED (A128965 DIV 3)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $2,625.49 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE JUL-19-2012,, (APPEAL); PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT SF OAKLAND BAY, LLC

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: HULCHIY, NICHOLAS PETER SUBSTITUTED FOR ZELL, DENNIS SCOTT AS ATTORNEY FOR PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: EDWARDS, CORIE A SUBSTITUTED FOR HULCHIY, NICHOLAS PETER AS ATTORNEY FOR SF OAKLAND BAY, LLC

ORDER

ORDER AFTER HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER WRITTEN RESPONSES TO INSPECTION DEMANDS; A FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PORTSIDE MASTER OWNERS' ASSOCIATION AND ITS COUNSEL, JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY

STIPULATION

STIPULATION TO EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FILED BY PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC SF OAKLAND BAY, LLC PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FILED BY PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC SF OAKLAND BAY, LLC PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AFTER HEARING ON DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • STIPULATION TO EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AS TO DEFENDANT PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC SF OAKLAND BAY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC SF OAKLAND BAY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AFTER HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER WRITTEN RESPONSES TO INSPECTION DEMANDS; A FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PORTSIDE MASTER OWNERS' ASSOCIATION AND ITS COUNSEL, JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DISCOVERY 302, DEFENDANTS PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC, SF OAKLAND BAY, LLC'S (AMENDED) MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER WRITTEN RESPONSES TO INSPECTION DEMANDS; A FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PORTSIDE MASTER OWNERS' ASSOCIATION AND ITS COUNSEL, JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY IS OFF CALENDAR, DUPLICATE ENTRY. =(302/JPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DISCOVERY 302, DEFENDANTS PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC, SF OAKLAND BAY, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER WRITTEN RESPONSES IS GRANTED. COUNSEL TO PREPARE THE ORDER. JUDGE PRO-TEM: ARLENE BARTON; CLERK: JACQUELINE ALAMEDA, NOT REPORTED. =(302/JPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-12-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC HUM BABY ASSOCIATES EMERALD FUND, INC. ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, OR INTEREST IN THE SUBJECT PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE TO THE SUBJECT PROPERTY DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (JOINDER) FILED BY DEFENDANT HUM BABY ASSOCIATES EMERALD FUND, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAR-11-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE ON CO-DEFENDANT ON DEMURRER OF DEFT PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC AGAINST COMPLAINT; NTC OF DEMURRER; MEMO OF PTS & AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NTC FILED BY DEFENDANT PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC HEARING SET FOR MAR-11-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES NTC OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT HUM BABY ASSOCIATES EMERALD FUND, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAR-16-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:780.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION SERVED JAN-22-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HUM BABY ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION SERVED JAN-02-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT ON DEFT, EMERALD FUND, INC., SIGNED AND DATED ON DEC-11-09 BY JACK WHOLEY. FILED BY PLAINTIFF PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PORTSIDE MASTER HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT PORTSIDE INVESTMENTS, LLC HUM BABY ASSOCIATES EMERALD FUND, INC. ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, OR INTEREST IN THE SUBJECT PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE TO THE SUBJECT PROPERTY DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-30-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-29-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-15-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less