Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 17:42:31 (UTC).

POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. VS. MARIA DEL SOCORRO MORENO et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARIA DEL SOCORRO MORENO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4201

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC.

Defendants

MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO

San Francisco, CA 941242136

MENDEZ, MARIA

San Francisco, CA 94124

RANGEL, JAVIER

DOES 1 TO 10

San Francisco, CA 941242136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOGAN, MIKE

900 E. Hamilton Ave, Suite 100

Campbell, CA 95008

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. SERVED FEB-11-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO DOES 1 TO 10 RANGEL, JAVIER

CLERKS JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER - POSSESSION ONLY

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO RANGEL, JAVIER THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 1619 KIRKWOOD AVENUE, SAN FRANCISCO, SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, CA. 94124-2136, ** INCLUDING ANY/ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES ** SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Notice to Defendants

NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AND NOTICE OF HEARING

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO RANGEL, JAVIER

STIPULATION

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC.

HEARING ON CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION

HEARING ON CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY DEFENDANT MENDEZ, MARIA AS TO PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. HEARING SET FOR APR-08-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:IFP)

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $87.40 FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC.

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO DOES 1 TO 10 RANGEL, JAVIER SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. SERVED FEB-11-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT RANGEL, JAVIER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. SERVED FEB-11-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO RANGEL, JAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, HEARING ON CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION BY DEFENDANT MARIA MENDEZ IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO FILE AND SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT NAMING CLAIMANT. JUDGE A. JAMES ROBERTSON, CLERK: M. OLOPERNES, NOT REPORTED (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-09-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, DEFENDANT MARIA MENDEZ'S HEARING ON CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION. NO COURTESY COPIES. CONTINUED TO APRIL 9, 2013. MOVING PARTY IS ORDERED TO COMPLY WITH SAN FRANCISCO LOCAL RULE 2.6(B) AND PROVIDE COURTESY COPY OF MOVING PAPERS NO LATER THAN APRIL 8, 2013 BY 12:00PM. JUDGE RONALD E. QUIDACHAY, CLERK K. LIU, NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-08-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING ON CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY DEFENDANT MENDEZ, MARIA AS TO PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. HEARING SET FOR APR-08-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT MENDEZ, MARIA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO RANGEL, JAVIER (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $87.40 FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO RANGEL, JAVIER THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 1619 KIRKWOOD AVENUE, SAN FRANCISCO, SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, CA. 94124-2136, ** INCLUDING ANY/ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES ** SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO DOES 1 TO 10 RANGEL, JAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, COURT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO RANGEL, JAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. SERVED FEB-11-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. SERVED FEB-11-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. SERVED FEB-11-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT RANGEL, JAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLYMATHIC PROPERTIES, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT MORENO, MARIA DEL SOCORRO DOES 1 TO 10 RANGEL, JAVIER SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less