This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/06/2021 at 14:35:29 (UTC).

POLYCHAIN FUND I LP ET AL VS. HARRY GREENHOUSE

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 POLYCHAIN FUND I LP filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against HARRY GREENHOUSE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7357

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

POLYCHAIN FUND I LP

POLYCHAIN PARTNERS LLC F/K/A POLYCHAIN 2030 LLC.

Respondent

GREENHOUSE, HARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HAGEY, J. NOAH

Attorney at BRAUN HAGEY & BORNDEN, LLP

220 Sansome Street, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PETITIONER POLYCHAIN FUND I LP POLYCHAIN PARTNERS LLC F/K/A POLYCHAIN 2030 LLC. AS TO RESPONDENT GREENHOUSE, HARRY JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF J. NOAH HAGEY IN SUPPORT OF PERIRIONER'S PERIRION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT THEREON FILED BY PETITIONER POLYCHAIN FUND I LP POLYCHAIN PARTNERS LLC F/K/A POLYCHAIN 2030 LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT 1 TO PETITIONERS POLYCHAIN FUND I LP'S AND POLYCHAIN PARTNERS LLC FKA POLYCHAIN 2030 LLC'S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (CONDITIONALLY SEALED) FILED BY PETITIONER POLYCHAIN FUND I LP POLYCHAIN PARTNERS LLC F/K/A POLYCHAIN 2030 LLC. AS TO RESPONDENT GREENHOUSE, HARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF J. NOAH HAGEY IN SUPPORT OF PERIRIONER'S PERIRION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT THEREON FILED BY PETITIONER POLYCHAIN FUND I LP POLYCHAIN PARTNERS LLC F/K/A POLYCHAIN 2030 LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0921204F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PETITIONER POLYCHAIN FUND I LP POLYCHAIN PARTNERS LLC F/K/A POLYCHAIN 2030 LLC. AS TO RESPONDENT GREENHOUSE, HARRY JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7357
Case Title:POLYCHAIN FUND I LP ET AL VS. HARRY GREENHOUSE
Court Date:MAR-16-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Petitioners Notice Of Motion And Motion To File Record Under Seal; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof
Rulings:Matter on the Law & Motion Calendar for Tuesday, March 16, 2021, Line 4, 1- PETITIONERS POLYCHAIN FUND I L AND POLYCHAIN PARTNERS LLC's Motion To File Record Under Seal.Petitioners' unopposed motion to seal Exhibit 1 to the Petition is granted. The Court determines that there is good cause to warrant sealing pursuant to Cal. Rule of Court 2.550. The Award contains commercially sensitive material. Petitioners shall prepare an order identifying the document to be sealed and set forth the following findings: (1) there exists an overriding interest that overcomes the right of public access to the record; (2) the overriding interest supports sealing the record; (3) a substantial probability exists that the overriding interest will be prejudiced if the record is not sealed; (4) the proposed sealing is narrowly tailored; and (5) no less restrictive means exist to achieve the overriding interest. Counsel for petitioners must email the order to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing.=(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******7357
Case Title:POLYCHAIN FUND I LP ET AL VS. HARRY GREENHOUSE
Court Date:APR-14-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Petitioners Polychain Fund I Lp And Polychain Partners Llc'S Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award [Per Ex Parte Order Filed 3/24/2021]
Rulings:Matter on the Law & Motion Calendar for Wednesday, April 14, 2021, Line 1, Petitioners Polychain Fund I LP and Polychain Partners LLC's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award.Stayed by automatic stay in bankruptcy (respondent's Chapter 11 petition filed 3/26/21). (11 U.S.C. Sec. 362(a).) =(302/EPS)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAGEY, J. NOAH