This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/28/2019 at 11:44:22 (UTC).

PIVITOL SYSTEMS CORPORATION VS. CONNECT ELECTRONICS USA, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by PIVITOL SYSTEMS CORPORATION against CONNECT ELECTRONICS USA, INC in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4279

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIVITOL SYSTEMS CORPORATION

Defendants

CONNECT ELECTRONICS USA, INC.

DOES 1 TO 10

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIVITOL SYSTEMS CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT CONNECT ELECTRONICS USA, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-29-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-29-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DIS

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (TRANSACTION ID # 100041822) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONNECT ELECTRONICS USA, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4918717F005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1518213F024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-29-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (TRANSACTION ID # 100041822) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONNECT ELECTRONICS USA, INC. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-29-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIVITOL SYSTEMS CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT CONNECT ELECTRONICS USA, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less