This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 14:46:29 (UTC).

PHYLLIS M. BALDWIN et al VS. WYETH LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2013 PHYLLIS M BALDWIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against WYETH LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1786

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M.

BUNDY, BONNIE J.

CAYER, DIANE

GEORGE, LARRY D.

Defendants

ALAVEN PHARMACEUTICAL LLC

BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION

MEDA AB

MEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

PFIZER, INC.

SCHWARZ PHARMA AG

SCHWARZ PHARMA, INC.

UCB INC.

UCB SA

WOCKHARDT USA, LLC

WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A LEDERLE

WYETH LLC

WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A ESI LEDERLE, INC.

WYETH, INC.

BEACH PRODUCTS, INC.

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOKE, CURTIS G

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE GEORGE, LARRY D. AS TO DEFENDANT WYETH LLC WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A ESI LEDERLE, INC. WYETH, INC. WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A LEDERLE PFIZER, INC. SCHWARZ PHARMA, INC. SCHWARZ PHARMA AG UCB SA UCB INC. ALAVEN PHARMACEUTICAL LLC MEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. MEDA AB BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION WOCKHARDT USA, LLC MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-30-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-29-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-15-2013 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE GEORGE, LARRY D. AS TO DEFENDANT WYETH LLC WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A ESI LEDERLE, INC. WYETH, INC. WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A LEDERLE PFIZER, INC. SCHWARZ PHARMA, INC. SCHWARZ PHARMA AG UCB SA UCB INC. ALAVEN PHARMACEUTICAL LLC MEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. MEDA AB BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION WOCKHARDT USA, LLC MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED JUN-07-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED MAY-31-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT GOLDLINE LABORATORIES, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED MAY-31-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT PLIVA, INC, INDIVIDUALLY AND F/K/A SIDMAK LABORATORIES, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED MAY-31-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC F/K/A BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED JUN-07-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BARR LABORATORIES, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED JUN-07-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC F/K/A DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS INC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE SERVED JUL-15-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT UCB INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-30-2013 CONTINUED TO FEB-26-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 20.0 DAYS

NOTICE

NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE GEORGE, LARRY D.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 20.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-26-2014 CONTINUED TO JUN-25-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF COORDINATION ORDER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE

NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING CMC FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE GEORGE, LARRY D.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED COORDINATING ADD-ON ACTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE GEORGE, LARRY D.

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-25-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. COORDINATED WITH JCCP 4631. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/09/2014
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-25-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. COORDINATED WITH JCCP 4631. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED COORDINATING ADD-ON ACTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE GEORGE, LARRY D.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING CMC FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE GEORGE, LARRY D.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2014
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-26-2014 CONTINUED TO JUN-25-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF COORDINATION ORDER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2014
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 20.0 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE GEORGE, LARRY D.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2013
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 20.0 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2013
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-30-2013 CONTINUED TO FEB-26-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE SERVED JUL-15-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT UCB INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ADR PACKAGE; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NTC TO PLNTF; AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE GEORGE, LARRY D. SERVED JUN-03-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JUN-03-2013 ON DEFENDANT KING PHARMACEUTICALS INC INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA ALPHARMA INC, FKA A L PHARMA INC AND ALPHARMA INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
07/02/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED JUN-07-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC F/K/A DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED JUN-07-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BARR LABORATORIES, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED MAY-31-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC F/K/A BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED MAY-31-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT PLIVA, INC, INDIVIDUALLY AND F/K/A SIDMAK LABORATORIES, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED MAY-31-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT GOLDLINE LABORATORIES, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED JUN-07-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2013

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. SERVED MAY-31-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2013
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE GEORGE, LARRY D. AS TO DEFENDANT WYETH LLC WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A ESI LEDERLE, INC. WYETH, INC. WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A LEDERLE PFIZER, INC. SCHWARZ PHARMA, INC. SCHWARZ PHARMA AG UCB SA UCB INC. ALAVEN PHARMACEUTICAL LLC MEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. MEDA AB BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION WOCKHARDT USA, LLC MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2013
View Court Documents

DocketPRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BALDWIN, PHYLLIS M. BUNDY, BONNIE J. CAYER, DIANE GEORGE, LARRY D. AS TO DEFENDANT WYETH LLC WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A ESI LEDERLE, INC. WYETH, INC. WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A LEDERLE PFIZER, INC. SCHWARZ PHARMA, INC. SCHWARZ PHARMA AG UCB SA UCB INC. ALAVEN PHARMACEUTICAL LLC MEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. MEDA AB BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION WOCKHARDT USA, LLC MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-30-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-29-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-15-2013 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less