This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 14:24:26 (UTC).

PHILIAM CUA KENNEDY VS. RYAN KENNEDY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 PHILIAM CUA KENNEDY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RYAN KENNEDY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8710

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KENNEDY, PHILIAM CUA

San Francisco, CA 94103

Respondent

KENNEDY, RYAN

San Jose, CA 95111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2013
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS AUG-11-2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • STIPULATION AND MUTUAL WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT KENNEDY, RYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER KENNEDY, PHILIAM CUA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT KENNEDY, RYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED SUBMITTED BY: PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • APPEARANCE, STIPULATION, AND WAIVERS FILED BY PETITIONER KENNEDY, PHILIAM CUA (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • FINAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER KENNEDY, PHILIAM CUA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: FEB-10-2013 FILED BY PETITIONER KENNEDY, PHILIAM CUA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER KENNEDY, PHILIAM CUA AS TO RESPONDENT KENNEDY, RYAN SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less