This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/17/2019 at 04:19:03 (UTC).

PETER PAPPAS et al VS. BANK OF AMERICA N.A.AKA U.S. TRUST BANK OF AMERICA et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2010 PETER PAPPAS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA N A AKA U S TRUST BANK OF AMERICA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, HAROLD E. KAHN, ARLENE T. BORICK, TERI L. JACKSON and PETER J. BUSCH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2851

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

HAROLD E. KAHN

ARLENE T. BORICK

TERI L. JACKSON

PETER J. BUSCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAPPAS, SOPHIE

PAPPAS, PETER

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 500, INCL.

SCHIFFERLE, FREDERICK A.

NEWBURY, THOMAS

OERTH, JUNE

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.AKA U.S. TRUST BANK OF AMERICA IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE

DOES 3 10 500, INCLUSIVE

SMALLWOOD, STANLEY T.

D.P.P.M.,INC. DBA ZEPHYR REAL ESTATE

OERTH, PAUL

BOARDWALK INVESTMENT GROUP, INCORPORATED DBA BOARDWALK REALTY

BOARDWALK INVESTMENT GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOLDSTEIN, RICHARD STEPHEN

Attorney at GOLDSTEIN, GELLMAN, MELBOSTAD, GIBSON & HARRIS, LLP

1388 Sutter Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 941095494

ZACKS, ANDREW MAYER

Attorney at ZACKS & FREEDMAN, P.C.

235 Montgomery St Ste 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

POWELL, DAVID CARLYLE

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

SMITH, STANLEY WAYNE

Attorney at NIVEN & SMITH

425 California Street, Suite 1625

San Francisco, CA 941042216

SMITH, MICHAEL LLOYD

Attorney at MANNING & KASS, ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTER LLP

One California St, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

EXHIBITS IN OPPOS TO MTNS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY BOA, SCHIFFERLE, BOARDWALK, AND SMALLWOOD; AND DECLARATION OF JAMES B. KRAUS FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTIONS TO DEFTS' EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MTNS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY BOA, SCHIFFERLE, BOARDWALK, AND SMALLWOOD FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT IN OPPOS TO MTNS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ADJUDICATION BY BOARDWALK AND SMALLWOOD FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTION TO DEC OF SOPHIE PAPPAS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOS. TO MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT SMALLWOOD, STANLEY T. BOARDWALK INVESTMENT GROUP, INC.

REPLY

REPLY TO OPPOS. TO MTN OF DEFT'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION TO THE SECOND AMENDED OF PETER PAPPAS AND SOPHIE PAPPAS; MEMO OF P & A AND DEC. OF PETERC. CATALANOTTI FILED BY DEFENDANT SMALLWOOD, STANLEY T. BOARDWALK INVESTMENT GROUP, INC.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF ERIC S. VANDERPOOL IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A.AKA U.S. TRUST BANK OF AMERICA IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE SCHIFFERLE, FREDERICK A.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

SEP. STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR REPLY TO PLTF'S OPPOS. TO MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A.AKA U.S. TRUST BANK OF AMERICA IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE SCHIFFERLE, FREDERICK A.

REPLY

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A.AKA U.S. TRUST BANK OF AMERICA IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE SCHIFFERLE, FREDERICK A.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION; SEP. STATEMENT AND DEC FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A.AKA U.S. TRUST BANK OF AMERICA IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE SCHIFFERLE, FREDERICK A.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE SERVED SEP-10-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT NEWBURY, THOMAS

GENERAL DENIAL

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT D.P.P.M.,INC. DBA ZEPHYR REAL ESTATE NEWBURY, THOMAS

COMPLAINT

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE AS TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A.AKA U.S. TRUST BANK OF AMERICA IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE SCHIFFERLE, FREDERICK A. D.P.P.M.,INC. DBA ZEPHYR REAL ESTATE NEWBURY, THOMAS BOARDWALK INVESTMENT GROUP, INCORPORATED DBA BOARDWALK REALTY SMALLWOOD, STANLEY T. OERTH, PAUL OERTH, JUNE DOES 3 10 500, INCLUSIVE

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A.AKA U.S. TRUST BANK OF AMERICA IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE SCHIFFERLE, FREDERICK A.

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER (STIPULATED) TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND SET MEDIATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE (Fee:40.00)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT OERTH, PAUL

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2011
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2111C21M021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2111B21M041

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2111B18M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CASH; Receipt Number : W2011A13M007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2111607M021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R3511401M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W3611324C007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2010C06M019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R0910B05M005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $820; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R0910B05F004

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A.AKA U.S. TRUST BANK OF AMERICA IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE SCHIFFERLE, FREDERICK A. HEARING SET FOR NOV-18-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:$780.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE SERVED SEP-27-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SCHIFFERLE, FREDERICK A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE SERVED SEP-10-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT NEWBURY, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE SERVED SEP-08-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SMALLWOOD, STANLEY T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE SERVED SEP-08-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BOARDWALK INVESTMENT GROUP, INCORPORATED DBA BOARDWALK REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE SERVED SEP-02-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT D.P.P.M.,INC. DBA ZEPHYR REAL ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE SERVED SEP-07-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A.AKA U.S. TRUST BANK OF AMERICA IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT D.P.P.M.,INC. DBA ZEPHYR REAL ESTATE NEWBURY, THOMAS (Fee:$740.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAPPAS, PETER PAPPAS, SOPHIE AS TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A.AKA U.S. TRUST BANK OF AMERICA IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE SCHIFFERLE, FREDERICK A. D.P.P.M.,INC. DBA ZEPHYR REAL ESTATE NEWBURY, THOMAS BOARDWALK INVESTMENT GROUP, INCORPORATED DBA BOARDWALK REALTY SMALLWOOD, STANLEY T. DOES 1 TO 500, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-21-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-18-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-06-2011 (Fee:$370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less