This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 13:21:54 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS VS. MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/06/2013 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL DENNIS filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1161

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTO

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY

Defendants

MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

MONSTER ENERGY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HERRERA, DENNIS JOSE

KAISER, SHERRI SOKELAND

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

1390 Market St. 6Th Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94102-5408

Defendant Attorneys

GUGGENHEIM, MIRIAM J.

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

KIPNIS, GABRIELA

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER, LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIAS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MAT

(REDACTED) SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION REGARDING SUBSTANTIATION. (TRANSACTION ID # 58411545) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY

DECLARATION OF NATALIE M. ORR IN SUPPORT OF THE PEOPLES ONE SHOT RE ES

DECLARATION OF NATALIE M. ORR IN SUPPORT OF ONE SHOT RE ESI (TRANSACTION ID # 58031137) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY

Notice of Related Cases

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 54675311) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY

EXHIBIT 2 TO MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATIONS ONE-SHOT BRIEF NO. 3: REGARDING SUBPOENA SEEKING DOCUMENTS FROM CHANGELAB SOLUTIONS

EXHIBIT 2 TO MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATIONS ONE-SHOT BRIEF NO. 3: REGARDING SUBPOENA SEEKING DOCUMENTS FROM CHANGELAB SOLUTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 56954867) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.8 (TRANSACTION #57958749)

Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to File One-Shot Brief Regarding ESI

FILING FEE FOR STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE ONE-SHOT BRIEF REGARDING ESI (TRANSACTION ID # 56990536) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION MONSTER ENERGY COMPANY AS TO PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY (Fee:20.00)

EXHIBIT 8 TO MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATIONS ONE-SHOT BRIEF NO. 3: REGARDING SUBPOENA SEEKING DOCUMENTS FROM CHANGELAB SOLUTIONS

EXHIBIT 8 TO MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATIONS ONE-SHOT BRIEF NO. 3: REGARDING SUBPOENA SEEKING DOCUMENTS FROM CHANGELAB SOLUTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 56954867) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION

EXHIBITS 6-8 TO JOINT ONE-SHOT BRIEF REGARDING DEFENDANT MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATIONS THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENAS TO SCIENTISTS

EXHIBITS 6-8 TO JOINT "ONE-SHOT" BRIEF REGARDING THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENAS TO SCIENTISTS (TRANSACTION ID # 56294553) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION

APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE [PART 2 OF 2]

APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE [PART 2 OF 2] (TRANSACTION ID # 55015741) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION

334 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT D TO PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIAS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION AND MONSTER ENERGY COMPANYS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR PRECLUSION ORDER. (TRANSACTION ID # 58769430) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS A - C TO PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIAS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION AND MONSTER ENERGY COMPANYS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR PRECLUSION ORDER. (TRANSACTION ID # 58769430) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIAS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION AND MONSTER ENERGY COMPANYS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR PRECLUSION ORDER. (TRANSACTION ID # 58769430) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ERIN BERNSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIAS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION AND MONSTER ENERGY COMPANYS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR PRECLUSION ORDER. (TRANSACTION ID # 58769430) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION AND MONSTER ENERGY COMPANYS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR PRECLUSION ORDER. (TRANSACTION ID # 58769430) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.10 (TRANSACTION #58743522)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS HELD ON MAR-17-2016. MATTER IS SET FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-12-2016 AT 2:00 PM IN 304. JUDGE CURTIS E.A. KARNOW, CLERK DANIAL LEMIRE, REPORTER RENEE SERA, CSR #7435.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR MAR-17-2016 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (TRANSACTION ID # 58718315) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION MONSTER ENERGY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • ISSUING COMMISSION TO TAKE DEPOSITION OUT OF STATE UNDER CCP 2026 BURDOCK GROUP CONSULTANTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
402 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JENNIFER E. CHOI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO DESIGNATE CIVIL ACTION AS A COMPLEX CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT , TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). HEARING SET FOR NOV-20-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-09-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD REMANDED BACK TO SUPERIOR COURT CERTIFIED COPIES OF DOCKET ENTRIES AND REMAND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY SERVED MAY-06-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • BUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS HERRERA SAN FRANCISCO CITY ATTORNEY AS TO DEFENDANT MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-09-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-24-2013 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******1161
Case Title:PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA EX REL. DENNIS VS. MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION
Court Date:FEB-04-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Seal Portions Of Filings Made In Connection With Defendants Motion For Summary Adjudication Regarding Substantiation
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, February 4, 2016, Line 15, DEFENDANTS MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION AND MONSTER ENERGY COMPANY'S Motion To Seal Portions Of Filings Made In Connection With Defendants Motion For Summary Adjudication Regarding Substantiation is off calendar for department 302. This case has been singly assigned to Judge Karnow in department 304. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =(302/HK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monster Beverage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where MONSTER ENERGY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gabriela Kipnis