This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:46:21 (UTC).

PAUL WESTBROOK et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2007 PAUL WESTBROOK filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4440

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WESTBROOK, MARLENE

WESTBROOK, PAUL

Defendants

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

SB DECKING, INC.

ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

CARRIER COMMERCIAL REFRIGERATION, INC.

INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION

FOUR STAR OIL & GAS COMPANY

DOES 1-8500

M. SLAYEN & ASSOCIATES, INC.

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC.

UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

NORTHROP GRUMMAN SHIPBUILDING INC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO NORTHROP GRUMMAN SHIP SYSTEMS INC AND FKA NEWPORT NEWS SHIPBUILDING AND DRY DOCK COMPANY

BELL ASBESTOS MINES LTD.

3M COMPANY

Other

MEDICAL COUNSEL (DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL)

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

MA, LILLIAN C

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

135 Main St. Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

HARTLEY, EDWARD ELDON

Attorney at DILLINGHAM & MURPHY, LLP

225 Bush St. 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-4207

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

ROBINSON, RALPH WELLS

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2725

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94105

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 94105-2981

MORONEY, LINDA M.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorney

PRZETAK, LAURA

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORP.

2930 Lakeshore Avenue

Oakland, CA 94610

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES

275 Battery St 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

PFALZER, THOMAS E

Attorney at MCNAMARA, DODGE, NEY, BEATTY, SLATTERY, PFALZER, BORGES & BROTHERS LLP

1211 Newell Avenue, P.O. Box 5288

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

CUNNINGHAM, JAMES PATRICK

Attorney at CARROLL, BURDICK & MCDONOUGH

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

BLOMQUIST, SONJA ELIZABETH

Attorney at LOW, BALL & LYNCH

505 Montgomery St. 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

amendment to complaint

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17566897) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE RILEY POWER INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE SB DECKING, INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 3 TO BE ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

ANSWER OF ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM- ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17659121) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18458101) AS TO DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

DEFENDANT ABHI-CROCKETT, INC.???S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER (TRANSACTION ID # 19579729) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABHI-CROCKETT, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAY-22-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

Defendant Asbestos Corporation Ltds Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19688317) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD. (Fee:335.00)

amendment to complaint -- DOE 12 -- DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19835102) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 12 TO BE DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

Def. GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATIONs Demand for Triasl by Jury and Estimate of Length of Trial.

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 19836300) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22583164) FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIALS FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIALS FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 24257764) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

DECLARATION OF JACK C. HENNING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF JACK C. HENNING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 24271071) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION

DEFENDANT FRASER-EDWARDS CO. LLC?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 24276615)

EXHIBITS 17 THRU 22 TO THE DECLARATION OF LYSLE J. KAPP IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT M. SLAYEN AND ASSOCIATES, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO PLAINTIFFS? PRODUCT LIABILITY, FALSE REPRESENTATION, AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM CAUSES OF ACTION

EXHIBITS 17 THRU 22 TO THE DECLARATION OF LYSLE J. KAPP IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT M. SLAYEN AND ASSOCIATES, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO PLAINTIFFS PRODUCT LIABILITY, FALSE REPRESENTATION, AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM CAUSES OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 24320428) FILED BY DEFENDANT M. SLAYEN & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Request for Dismissal W/O PREJ AS TO COMPLT AS TO DEFT UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24149101) AS TO DEFENDANT UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 25307558) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WESTBROOK, PAUL WESTBROOK, MARLENE

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KATHERINE M. WATTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SB DECKING, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KATHERINE M. WATTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SB DECKING, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 25410924) FILED BY DEFENDANT SB DECKING, INC.

Defendant Asbestos Corp. Ltds Joinder to Co-Defendants Motion in Limine

JOINDER TO CO-DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 26428111) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine to Preclude All Reference and Testimony Regarding Ostensible Background or Ambient Exposure to Asbestos

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ALL REFERENCE AND TESTIMONY REGARDING OSTENSIBLE BACKGROUND OR AMBIENT EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS (TRANSACTION ID # 26474588) FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTHROP GRUMMAN SHIP SYSTEMS, INC.

Defendant Asbestos Corporation Ltd.s Amendment to Motion in Limine to Preclude the Admission of the Deposition of Robert Bockstahler

AMENDMENT TO MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE THE ADMISSION OF THE DEPOSITION OF ROBERT BOCKSTAHLER (TRANSACTION ID # 26605379) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

182 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014. DISMISSAL FILED 11/3/14. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56279246)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO MAY-08-2016 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF WESTBROOK, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-13-2012 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR THE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO THE ONLY REMAINING DEFENDANT, PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-16-2010 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 206 FOR STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER DIANA L. GONZALEZ, CSR #7935, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL, BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. AND/OR WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS) AND/OR WESTERN FIBERGLAS SUPPLY COMPANY (TRANSACTION ID # 31578154) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
239 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE / OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT OF COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 17597871) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17597871) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17566897) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE RILEY POWER INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE SB DECKING, INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 3 TO BE ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION - TURBO PUMP OPERATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 17546535) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION - TURBO PUMP OPERATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION - TURBO PUMP OPERATIONS OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 17546535) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION - TURBO PUMP OPERATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17546535) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION - TURBO PUMP OPERATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17332994) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1001 TO BE FOUR STAR OIL & GAS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF WESTBROOK, PAUL WESTBROOK, MARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WESTBROOK, PAUL WESTBROOK, MARLENE AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-16-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less