Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:47:27 (UTC).

PAUL MORRIS VS. TWAN COMPANY LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 PAUL MORRIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TWAN COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8442

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORRIS, PAUL

Defendants

TWAN COMPANY LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYNAN, KAREN

1083 Vine Street #201

Healdsburg, CA 95448

Defendant Attorney

LEPERA, JOSEPH A

Attorney at LEPERA + ASSOCIATES, PC

601 Montgomery Street, Ste 665

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MORRIS, PAUL SERVED FEB-25-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC

Order to Arbitration

ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR JUL-01-2013. JUN-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ARBITRATION JUDGMENT

PURSUANT TO CRC 3.827 (A), THE AWARD OF THE ARBITRATOR IS HEREBY ENTERED AS JUDGMENT. IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MORRIS, PAUL RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC $5,750.00 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,750.00, EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS OF SUIT. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC (Fee:225.00)

Notice of Random Selection From Panel of Arbitrators

PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE JUL-11-2013.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MORRIS, PAUL ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 HOURS

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MORRIS, PAUL AS TO DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:225.00)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator (CRC 3.815)

ARBITRATOR DAVID MICHAEL BIGELEISEN APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION JUL-12-2013 THROUGH OCT-10-2013.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MORRIS, PAUL SERVED FEB-28-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

AWARD FILED BY ARBITRATOR

AWARD FILED BY ARBITRATOR

PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR NORMAN STRAUS NAYFACH.

PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR NORMAN STRAUS NAYFACH.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PURSUANT TO CRC 3.827 (A), THE AWARD OF THE ARBITRATOR IS HEREBY ENTERED AS JUDGMENT. IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MORRIS, PAUL RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC $5,750.00 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,750.00, EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS OF SUIT. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AWARD FILED BY ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ARBITRATOR DAVID MICHAEL BIGELEISEN APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION JUL-12-2013 THROUGH OCT-10-2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR NORMAN STRAUS NAYFACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE JUL-11-2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR JUL-01-2013. JUN-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MORRIS, PAUL ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MORRIS, PAUL SERVED FEB-25-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MORRIS, PAUL SERVED FEB-28-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MORRIS, PAUL AS TO DEFENDANT TWAN COMPANY LLC DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less