This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 06:29:42 (UTC).

PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE VS. HARVEY WRIGHT et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2012 PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE filed an Other lawsuit against HARVEY WRIGHT. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8244

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC

Defendants

MAURUS, JENNIFER

HELICAL PLANE, INC.

WRIGHT, HARVEY

HELICAL PLANE INC, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 100, INCL.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

HELICAL PLANE, INC.

Cross Defendant

MITCHELL, PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LYKKEN, MICHAEL R

Attorney at SOARES & LYKKEN, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

P O Box 1138

Carmel, CA 93921

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

COLT, DOUG

Attorney at COLT WALLERSTEIN LLP

255 Shoreline Dr. Ste. 540

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

DANIEL, CRAIG C

Attorney at AXCEL LAW PARTNERS LLP

4 Embarcadero Center, 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC AS TO DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER DOES 1 TO 100, INCL. HELICAL PLANE INC, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-13-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-28-2012 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER HEARING SET FOR APR-30-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:820.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT JOINDER IN HARVEY WRIGHT AND JENNIFER MAURUS DEMURRER AND NTC OF DEMURRER AND POS FILED BY DEFENDANT HELICAL PLANE, INC. HEARING SET FOR APR-30-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC

REPLY

REPLY IN SUPP IN SUPP OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC SERVED FEB-16-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MAURUS, JENNIFER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC SERVED FEB-17-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAR-03-2012 ON DEFENDANT HELICAL PLANE, INC.

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC AS TO DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER DOES 1 TO 100, INCL. HELICAL PLANE INC, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF COLT/WATERSTEIN AND MEMO OF P&A FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC HEARING SET FOR JUL-06-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFENDANT HELICAL PLANE, INC.

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT HELICAL PLANE, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT MITCHELL, PAUL

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING OCT-29-2013 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR OCT-29-2013 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR OCT-29-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE AUG-28-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO DISMISS THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER (Fee:60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DOUG COLT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DOUG COLT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-17-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-28-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTE: BANKRUPTCY CASE 12-31725 WAS TERMINATED ON JUL-20-2012. PARTIES TO PROVIDE UPDATED BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER IF DEFENDANT HELICAL PLANE, INC. IS STILL IN BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-16-2013 CONTINUED TO JUL-17-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS HARVEY WRIGHT, JENNIFER MAURUS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT. CONTINUED TO MAY 8, 2012 TO GIVE PLAINTIFF AN OPPORTUNITY TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 2.6B. PLAINTIFF MUST DELIVER COURTESY COPIES OF HIS OPPOSITION PAPERS TO DEPARTMENT 302 NO LATER THAN MAY 1 WITH A COVER LETTER STATING THE NEW HEARING DATE. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; REPORTER: SONIA WONG, CSR #11288

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR APR-30-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR APR-30-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY IN SUPP IN SUPP OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT JOINDER IN HARVEY WRIGHT AND JENNIFER MAURUS DEMURRER AND NTC OF DEMURRER AND POS FILED BY DEFENDANT HELICAL PLANE, INC. HEARING SET FOR APR-30-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER HEARING SET FOR APR-30-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:820.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HELICAL PLANE INC AS TO DEFENDANT WRIGHT, HARVEY MAURUS, JENNIFER DOES 1 TO 100, INCL. HELICAL PLANE INC, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-13-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-28-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******8244
Case Title:PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE VS. HARVEY WRIGHT et al
Court Date:JUL-06-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Disqualification Of Colt/Waterstein And Memo Of P&A
Rulings:Set for hearing on Friday, July 5, 2012, Line 15, PLAINTIFF PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE Motion For Disqualification Of Colt/Waterstein.Off calendar. A Notice of Stay of Proceedings was filed June 8, 2012. =(302/HEK)


Case Number:*******8244
Case Title:PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE VS. HARVEY WRIGHT et al
Court Date:MAY-08-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, May 8, 2012, Line 18. DEFENDANTS HARVEY WRIGHT AND JENNIFER MAURUS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT. Sustained with ten days leave to amend as to the eighth cause of action and overruled as to the sixth, ninth, tenth, eleventh, and twelfth causes of action. As to the eighth cause of action, Plaintiff is given leave to amend to plead the grounds upon which the cause of action is based. The remaining causes of action are properly pled. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. = (302/HEK)


Case Number:*******8244
Case Title:PAUL MITCHELL IN THE RIGHT OF AND FOR THE VS. HARVEY WRIGHT et al
Court Date:APR-30-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON MONDAY, APRIL 30, 2012, LINE 16, DEFENDANT HELICAL PLANE, INC. DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT.Continued to May 8, 2012 to give plaintiff an opportunity to comply with Local Rule 2.6B. Plaintiff must deliver courtesy copies of its opposition papers to department 302 no later than May 1 with a cover letter stating the new hearing date. = (302/HEK)