Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 13:25:08 (UTC).

PAUL BOSCHETTO VS. VOSS BORETA et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2010 PAUL BOSCHETTO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOSS BORETA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5123

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants, Appellants and Cross Plaintiffs

BURSCHERA, CARMEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE ARTHUR BRUSCHERA ADMINSTRATIVE TRUST AND, THE ARTHUR AND CARMEN BRUSCHEDRA LIVING TRUST

BRUSCHERA, JAMES ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BORETA, VOSS ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Las Vegas, NV 89134

FREAR, DAVID

LUGO, ARACELI, AS THE SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF VASO BORETA AND AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE VASO BORETA 2000 TRUST

FLAMINGO PARADISE PARTNERS, A PARTNERSHIP

FLAMINGO PARADISE PARTNERS

BRUSCHERA, ARTHUR ,AN INDIVIDUAL

BURSCHERA, CARMEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE ARTHUR BRUSCHERA ADMINSTRATIVE TRUST AND, THE ARTHUR AND CARMEN BRUSCHEDRA LIVING TRUST

BORETA, CRAIG ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Tiburon, CA 94920

BRUSCHERA, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL

SCATENA, DAVID ,AN INDIVIDUAL

BRUSCHERA, JAMES ,AN INDIVIDUAL

FEAR, DAVID ,AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 THORUOGH 50, INCLUSIVE

BORETA, JOHN ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Las Vegas, NV 89144

BRUSCHERA, CARMEN , AS TRUSTEE OF THE ARTHUR BRUSCHERA ADMINSTRATIVE TRUST AND TO CARMEN BRUSCHERA LIVING TRUST (BOTH ENTITIES), AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

FREAR, DAVID

ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

THE ESTATE OF VASO BORETA

ARACELI LUGO AS TRUSTEE OF THE VASO BORETA 2000 TRUST AS AMENDED 2007

LUGO, ARACELI, AS THE SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF VASO BORETA AND AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE VASO BORETA 2000 TRUST

FLAMINGO PARADISE PARTNERS, A PARTNERSHIP

FLAMINGO PARADISE PARTNERS

THE VASO BORETA 2000 TRUST

BORETA, CRAIG ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Tiburon, CA 94920

MOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

FEAR, DAVID ,AN INDIVIDUAL

BORETA, JOHN ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Las Vegas, NV 89144

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

RINALDO, ALFRED LEON

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ALFRED L. RINALDO, JR.

2680 North 1St Street, Ste 200

San Jose, CA 95134-2039

POLVERARI, JOSEPH ROBERT

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH R POLVERARI SR

333 West San Carlos St 8Th Fl

San Jose, CA 95110

FRESCH, ELAINE K

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MORGER, STEVEN MICHAEL

Attorney at WENDEL ROSEN BLACK & DEAN

1111 Broadway, 24Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607-2047

JONES, KENNETH G.

Attorney at BOWLES & VERNA

2121 N. California Blvd., #875

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ROSS, GILLIAN MAILEY

Attorney at WENDEL, ROSEN, BLACK & DEAN, LLP

1111 Broadway, 24Th Floor

Oakland, CA 946074036

DUNCAN, DAVID T.

Other Attorneys

KNOPFLER, GEORGE

111 Universal Hollywood Drive, 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 91608

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGMENT

Cross-Complainants Carmen Bruschera, et al.s Objections to Proposed Judgment

CROSS-COMPLAINANTS CARMEN BRUSCHERA, ET AL.S OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56692495) FILED BY DEFENDANT BURSCHERA, CARMEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE ARTHUR BRUSCHERA ADMINSTRATIVE TRUST AND, THE ARTHUR AND CARMEN BRUSCHEDRA LIVING TRUST

CROSS-COMPLAINANTS CARMEN BRUSCHERA, et al.s Objections to Proposed Judgment

OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56811974) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BRUSCHERA, JAMES ,AN INDIVIDUAL BRUSCHERA, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL BRUSCHERA, CARMEN , AS TRUSTEE OF THE ARTHUR BRUSCHERA ADMINSTRATIVE TRUST AND TO CARMEN BRUSCHERA LIVING TRUST (BOTH ENTITIES), AN INDIVIDUAL

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS AND A AGAINST CROSS-COMPLAINTANTS WHO SHALL TAKE NOTHING ON THEIR SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Notice of Entry of Judgment with Exhibits A and B

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56869673) WITH EXHIBITS A AND B FILED BY DEFT'S

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BORETA, VOSS ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, RON ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, JOHN ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, CRAIG ,AN INDIVIDUAL FREAR, DAVID FLAMINGO PARADISE PARTNERS

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF KENNETH B. MCKENZIE IN RESP TO OSC RE MEDIATION FILED BY DEFENDANT BORETA, VOSS ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, RON ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, JOHN ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, CRAIG ,AN INDIVIDUAL FEAR, DAVID ,AN INDIVIDUAL FLAMINGO PARADISE PARTNERS

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWERS, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS, FROM RON BORETA TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFT AND HIS COUNSEL IN THE SUM OF $1987.50; MEMO OF P&A DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR AUG-23-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWERS, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS, FROM RON BORETA TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFT AND HIS COUNSEL IN THE SUM OF $1987.50; MEMO OF P&A DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR AUG-23-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS FILED BY DEFENDANT BORETA, CRAIG ,AN INDIVIDUAL

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

Cross-Complainants Reply Brief To Cross-Defendants Opposition To Motion To Continue Trial Date

REPLY BRIEF TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 55822150) FILED BY DEFENDANT BRUSCHERA, JAMES ,AN INDIVIDUAL BRUSCHERA, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL BURSCHERA, CARMEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE ARTHUR BRUSCHERA ADMINSTRATIVE TRUST AND, THE ARTHUR AND CARMEN BRUSCHEDRA LIVING TRUST

Notice Of Motion And Motion Of Cross-Complainants Carmen Bruschera As Trustee Of The Athur Bruschera Administrative Trust And The Carmen Bruschera Living Trust, James Bruschera, Paul Bruscheras Compel; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Separate Statements; Declaration Of Todd A. Duplanty

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS CARMEN BRUSCHERA AS TRUSTEE OF THE ATHUR BRUSCHERA ADMINISTRATIVE TRUST AND THE CARMEN BRUSCHERA LIVING TRUST, JAMES BRUSCHERA, PAUL BRUSCHERAS (TRANSACTION ID # 56050151) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BRUSCHERA, JAMES ,AN INDIVIDUAL BRUSCHERA, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL BRUSCHERA, CARMEN , AS TRUSTEE OF THE ARTHUR BRUSCHERA ADMINSTRATIVE TRUST AND TO CARMEN BRUSCHERA LIVING TRUST (BOTH ENTITIES), AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR SEP-19-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

The Bruscheras Amended Objections to the Tentative Statement of Decision

THE BRUSCHERAS AMENDED OBJECTIONS TO THE TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION (TRANSACTION ID # 56533980) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BRUSCHERA, ARTHUR ,AN INDIVIDUAL BRUSCHERA, JAMES ,AN INDIVIDUAL BRUSCHERA, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL BURSCHERA, CARMEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE ARTHUR BRUSCHERA ADMINSTRATIVE TRUST AND, THE ARTHUR AND CARMEN BRUSCHEDRA LIVING TRUST BRUSCHERA, CARMEN , AS TRUSTEE OF THE ARTHUR BRUSCHERA ADMINSTRATIVE TRUST AND TO CARMEN BRUSCHERA LIVING TRUST (BOTH ENTITIES), AN INDIVIDUAL

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $410.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE MAR-28-2015,, (TRANSACTION ID # 56876654) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORETA, VOSS ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, RON ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, JOHN ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, CRAIG ,AN INDIVIDUAL FREAR, DAVID FLAMINGO PARADISE PARTNERS LUGO, ARACELI, AS THE SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF VASO BORETA AND AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE VASO BORETA 2000 TRUST

Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Tax Costs

PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TAX COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 57071374) FILED BY DEFENDANT BURSCHERA, CARMEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE ARTHUR BRUSCHERA ADMINSTRATIVE TRUST AND, THE ARTHUR AND CARMEN BRUSCHEDRA LIVING TRUST

226 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR DISMISSED A144996 DIV 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $480.00 RE 33315 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO AIKEN & WELCH (CSR HARRIS), DOC#1907034099, WARRANT #38203968, DATED SEP-03-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $80.00 RE 33315 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO AIKEN WELCH (CSR SAYERS), DOC #1907034098, WARRANT #38203968, DATED SEP-02-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $225.00 RE 33315 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO SELMAN BREITMAN LLP, DOC #1906924659, WARRANT #38203870, DATED JUL-13-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $100.00 RE 33315 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO CSR VAUGHN, DOC #1906924653, WARRANT #38203868, DATED JUL-13-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 8.124, 5 VOLS RT (APPEAL FILED 4/17/15, A144996 DIV 3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-22-2015 03:00 PM FOR DEPT 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • TRIAL MOTION IN DEPT. 306, CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS IS GRANTED, PENDING WRITTEN ORDER. JUDGE RICHARD ULMER, CLERK S. RAVINANTAPRICHA. NOT REPORTED. (306)

    Read MoreRead Less
408 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED DEC-30-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT FEAR, DAVID ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED DEC-15-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-28-2010 ON DEFENDANT BRUSCHERA, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED DEC-15-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-28-2010 ON DEFENDANT BRUSCHERA, JAMES ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED DEC-15-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-28-2010 ON DEFENDANT BRUSCHERA, ARTHUR ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED DEC-20-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BORETA, RON ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED DEC-28-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT BORETA, VOSS ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED DEC-17-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BORETA, JOHN ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED DEC-21-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BORETA, CRAIG ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOSCHETTO, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT BORETA, VOSS ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, RON ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, JOHN ,AN INDIVIDUAL BORETA, CRAIG ,AN INDIVIDUAL BRUSCHERA, ARTHUR ,AN INDIVIDUAL BRUSCHERA, JAMES ,AN INDIVIDUAL BRUSCHERA, PAUL ,AN INDIVIDUAL FEAR, DAVID ,AN INDIVIDUAL SCATENA, DAVID ,AN INDIVIDUAL FLAMINGO PARADISE PARTNERS, A PARTNERSHIP DOES 1 THORUOGH 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-08-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-03-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-24-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESQ. GEORGE KNOPFLER