This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 21:37:11 (UTC).

PATRIK DIBDIAK ET AL VS. FERNANDO NELSON & SONS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 PATRIK DIBDIAK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FERNANDO NELSON SONS,. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3983

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURNS, JON AN INDIVIDUAL

DIBDIAK, PATRIK AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS' TITLE THERETO

BADER, KURT AN INDIVIDUAL

BENAZZO, STEVEN R. AN INDIVIDUAL, AS TRUSTEE OF THE STEVEN R. BENAZZO 2017 REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, CREATED BY DECLARATION OF TRUST

CHUN, WILLIAM AN INDIVIDUAL

CRICHTON, EDITH G. AN INDIVIDUAL, AS TRUSTEE OF THE EDITH G. CRICHTON REVOCABLE TRUST,

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

FAZIO, JOSEPH ROBERT JOBLING AN INDIVIDUAL

FERNANDO NELSON & SONS, A DEFUNCT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, A STATE BANK

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, SOLELY AS NOMINEE FOR BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION;

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLACE, RICHARD JONATHON

Attorney at BRISCOE IVESTER & BAZEL LLP

235 Montgome1Y Street, Suite 935

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE, DECLARATORY RELIEF, AND INJUNCTION

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210026058) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIBDIAK, PATRIK AN INDIVIDUAL BURNS, JON AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT FERNANDO NELSON & SONS, A DEFUNCT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION; CHUN, WILLIAM AN INDIVIDUAL BADER, KURT AN INDIVIDUAL BENAZZO, STEVEN R. AN INDIVIDUAL, AS TRUSTEE OF THE STEVEN R. BENAZZO 2017 REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, CREATED BY DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 23, 2017 CRICHTON, EDITH G. AN INDIVIDUAL, AS TRUSTEE OF THE EDITH G. CRICHTON REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED AUGUST 25, 2014 FAZIO, JOSEPH ROBERT JOBLING AN INDIVIDUAL MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, SOLELY AS NOMINEE FOR BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, A STATE BANK ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS' TITLE THERETO DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-14-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-14-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-22-2023

Civil Case Coversheet (Cover Sheets)

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210026058) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIBDIAK, PATRIK AN INDIVIDUAL BURNS, JON AN INDIVIDUAL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Issued Summons (Summons)

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210026058) TO PLAINTIFF DIBDIAK, PATRIK AN INDIVIDUAL BURNS, JON AN INDIVIDUAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210026058) TO PLAINTIFF DIBDIAK, PATRIK AN INDIVIDUAL BURNS, JON AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H4823113F017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210026058) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIBDIAK, PATRIK AN INDIVIDUAL BURNS, JON AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketQUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210026058) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DIBDIAK, PATRIK AN INDIVIDUAL BURNS, JON AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT FERNANDO NELSON & SONS, A DEFUNCT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION; CHUN, WILLIAM AN INDIVIDUAL BADER, KURT AN INDIVIDUAL BENAZZO, STEVEN R. AN INDIVIDUAL, AS TRUSTEE OF THE STEVEN R. BENAZZO 2017 REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, CREATED BY DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 23, 2017 CRICHTON, EDITH G. AN INDIVIDUAL, AS TRUSTEE OF THE EDITH G. CRICHTON REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED AUGUST 25, 2014 FAZIO, JOSEPH ROBERT JOBLING AN INDIVIDUAL MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, SOLELY AS NOMINEE FOR BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, A STATE BANK ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS' TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS' TITLE THERETO DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-14-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-14-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-22-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less