This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:05:43 (UTC).

PATRICK BURKE, ET AL VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS RELFECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2007 PATRICK BURKE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS RELFECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4232

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURKE, JO ELLEN

Modesto, CA 95355

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

FREIGHTLINER LLC

CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

CHRYSLER LLC FKA DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY LLC

ACTUANT CORPORATION

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS RELFECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, G, H, I

DOES 1-8500

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC F/K/A FREIGHTLINER LLC

CSK AUTO, INC.

MACK TRUCKS, INC.

CATERPILLAR INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SII TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION

ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS

THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

PACCAR INC.

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

OSTHIMER, CHARLES EDWARD

Attorney at LECLAIRRYAN, LLP

44 Montgomery St., 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-4705

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

GOLDEN, CATHERINE ELLEN

Attorney at JACKSON JENKINS RENSTROM LLP

55 Francisco St. 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

Attorney at BASSI,MARTINI,EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

OSTERTAG, JAMES J

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

WASSERMAN, STEVEN DAVID

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 94105-2981

LEE, JENNIFER J.

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

STONE, MICHAEL TERRY

LOVE, MARK A

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

555 12Th Street, Suite 1280

Oakland, CA 94607

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Def. CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, sued erroneously herein as CUMMINS, INC.s

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15382056) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

Mack Trucks Incs Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15410086) FILED BY DEFENDANT MACK TRUCKS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15534771) FILED BY DEFENDANT FREIGHTLINER LLC (Fee:335.00)

Defendant General Motors Corporations Demand for Jury

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15560836) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15674151) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

Substitution of Attorneys (for PACCAR Inc.)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 19095489): BUTY, MADELINE L SUBSTITUTED FOR GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL AS ATTORNEY FOR PACCAR INC.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FROM WRIGHT, ROBINSON, OSTHIMER & TATUM, NOW TO LECLAIRRYAN, LLP (TRANSACTION ID # 20071297) FILED BY ATTORNEY OSTHIMER, CHARLES EDWARD

PROOFS OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL (Jo Ellen Burke)

PROOFS OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL (TRANSACTION ID # 25054414) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BURKE, JO ELLEN

Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant Ford Motor Company and Proof of Service

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 26132213): LANKFORD, PAUL V SUBSTITUTED FOR THOMAS, ANTHONY S. AS ATTORNEY FOR FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Defendant Ford Motor Companys Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15560836) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Actuant Corporations Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15962613) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACTUANT CORPORATION

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 16132617): HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL SUBSTITUTED FOR STONE, MICHAEL TERRY AS ATTORNEY FOR THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

Substitution of Attorney

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 23028466): KUENSTER, JENNIFER A. SUBSTITUTED FOR KUENSTER, JENNIFER A. AS ATTORNEY FOR DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMAPNY LLC, FORMER KNOWN AS DAIMLERCHRSLER CORPORATION ERRONEOUSLY ANS IMPROPERLY NAMED IN PLTF;S COMPLAINT AS AN ALTERNATE ENTITY OF AMERICAN LAFRANCE CORPORATION, GRAY MOTOR COMPANY AND GRAY MARINE

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23028466) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHRYSLER LLC FKA DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY LLC

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL- CIVIL (PATRICK BURKE)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL- CIVIL (PATRICK BURKE) (TRANSACTION ID # 23252327) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BURKE, PATRICK

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ? CIVIL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL CIVIL, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 24518793) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BURKE, PATRICK HEARING SET FOR APR-30-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - CIVIL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 24740209): LOVE, MARK A SUBSTITUTED FOR HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL AS ATTORNEY FOR THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

DECLARATION OF CONSTANCE F. MORRISON IN SUPPORT OF AN ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

DECLARATION OF CONSTANCE F. MORRISON IN SUPPORT OF AN ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (TRANSACTION ID # 37065188) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 54853941): LEE, JENNIFER J. SUBSTITUTED FOR LOVE, MARK A AS ATTORNEY FOR THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR JUN-21-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR JUN-21-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR JUN-21-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR JUN-21-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION 220, DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. THE COURT SIGNED DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY'S ORDER DISMISSING THE ENTIRE ACTION, THEREFORE MOOTING THE JOINDER. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR #7077. (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION 220, DEFENDANT CATERPILLAR INC.'S JOINDER TO CO-DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. THE COURT SIGNED DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY'S ORDER DISMISSING THE ENTIRE ACTION, THEREFORE MOOTING THE JOINDER. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR #7077. (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION 220, DEFENDANT CSK AUTO, INC.'S JOINDER TO DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. THE COURT SIGNED DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY'S ORDER DISMISSING THE ENTIRE ACTION, THEREFORE MOOTING THE JOINDER. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR#7077. (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION 220, DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR #7077. (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15534771) FILED BY DEFENDANT FREIGHTLINER LLC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS PUNITIVE AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES CLAIMS (TRANSACTION ID # 15520289) FILED BY DEFENDANT CATERPILLAR INC. AS TO PLAINTIFF BURKE, PATRICK (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15520289) FILED BY DEFENDANT CATERPILLAR INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15410086) FILED BY DEFENDANT MACK TRUCKS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE / OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 15393705) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15382056) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15382056) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF BURKE, PATRICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BURKE, PATRICK BURKE, JO ELLEN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS RELFECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, G, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less