This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 05:34:22 (UTC).

PATRICIA WALLIS et al VS. JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2011 PATRICIA WALLIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7904

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WALLIS, PATRICIA

WALLIS MD, TED W

Defendants

SCHMALZRIED MD, THOMAS

VAIL CONSULTING, LLC

DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.

VAIL MD, THOMAS

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC.

DEPUY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CABRASER, ELIZABETH JOAN

Attorney at LIEFF, CABRASER, HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN LLP

275 Battery St., 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

PATTERSON, ROBERT J.

Attorney at ANDERSON PATTERSON

44 East Ave Ste 203

Austin, CA 78701

Defendant Attorneys

CHILDERS, MICHELLE A.

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

50 Fremont Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105-2235

PULLIAM, THOMAS WEDDELL

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

50 Fremont St, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

HEALY, MICHAEL FITZGERALD

Attorney at SEDGWICK, LLP

333 Bush Street, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY PATTERSON, ROBERT J.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MIKAL WATTS, ESQ. AND WATTS GUERRA CRAFT, LLP'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS PATRICIA AND TED WALLIS (NO SASE, CC IN D302 OUTBOX)

MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD

MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W HEARING SET FOR OCT-09-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD

MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD, PROOF OF SERVICE, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W HEARING SET FOR OCT-09-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-07-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR, JCCP 4649. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF ROBERT J. PATTERSON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-08-2011 CONTINUED TO OCT-07-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W SERVED MAR-01-2011, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAR-03-2011 ON DEFENDANT SCHMALZRIED MD, THOMAS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W SERVED MAR-01-2011, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAR-22-2011 ON DEFENDANT VAIL MD, THOMAS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W SERVED MAR-01-2011, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAR-22-2011 ON DEFENDANT VAIL CONSULTING, LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W SERVED FEB-15-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W SERVED FEB-15-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W SERVED FEB-15-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DEPUY, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W SERVED FEB-15-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W AS TO DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. DEPUY, INC. VAIL CONSULTING, LLC VAIL MD, THOMAS SCHMALZRIED MD, THOMAS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-08-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-04-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-23-2011 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1510.00)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2014
  • PRO HAC VICE STATUS CALENDAR OF AUG-14-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR FOR CALENDAR SWEEP. (MAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • JUN-13-2012 PRO HAC VICE STATUS CALENDAR AS TO ATTORNEY ROBERT J. PATTERSON - OFF CALENDAR, RENEWAL FEES PAID ON OCT-04-2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY PATTERSON, ROBERT J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MIKAL WATTS, ESQ. AND WATTS GUERRA CRAFT, LLP'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS PATRICIA AND TED WALLIS (NO SASE, CC IN D302 OUTBOX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-09-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-09-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: RYAN THOMPSON'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFFS PATRICIA WALLIS AND TED WALLIS' IS OFF CALENDAR. THE MOTION SEEKS RELIEF COVERED BY THE MOTION FILED BY MR. WATTS AND THE WATTS GUERRA FIRM. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; COURT REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR # 7077 =(302/HEK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, RULING - THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. THE LAW FIRM OF WATTS GUERRA CRAFT'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS PATRICIA WALLIS AND TED WALLIS' IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED AND GOOD CAUSE SHOWN. ORDER SIGNED WITH THE MOVING PAPERS. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; COURT REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR # 7077 =302/HK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE PAID FOR ATTORNEY ROBERT J. PATTERSON (Fee:500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W SERVED FEB-15-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W SERVED FEB-15-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DEPUY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W SERVED FEB-15-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR APR-06-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • LAW AND MOTION, PLAINTIFFS PATRICIA WALLIS AND TED W. WALLIS, M.D.'S MOTION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT J. PATTERSON. NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING - GRANTED, NO OPPOSITION FILED. (PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE ORDER.) [ROBERT J. PATTERSON, ESQ., WATTS GUERRA CRAFT, LLP, 500 N. WATER STREET, SUITE 1200, CORPUS CHRISTI, TEXAS, 78401, PHONE: 361/887-0500, FAX: 361/887-0055, E-MAIL: BPATTERSON@WGCLAWFIRM.COM] (302)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING COORDINATION FILED BY DEFENDANT DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. (Fee:960.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION ROBERT J. PATTERSON FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W HEARING SET FOR APR-06-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALLIS, PATRICIA WALLIS MD, TED W AS TO DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. DEPUY, INC. VAIL CONSULTING, LLC VAIL MD, THOMAS SCHMALZRIED MD, THOMAS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-08-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-04-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-23-2011 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1510.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7904
Case Title:PATRICIA WALLIS et al VS. JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. et al
Court Date:APR-06-2011 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, April 6, 2011, line 10, PLAINTIFFS PATRICIA WALLIS, TED WALLIS MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. GRANTED, NO OPPOSITION FILED. =(302/LMG)


Case Number:*******7904
Case Title:PATRICIA WALLIS et al VS. JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC. et al
Court Date:OCT-09-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, October 9, 2012, Line 6, PLAINTIFF PATRICIA WALLIS, TED WALLIS' (ryan thompson) MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD.Off calendar. The motion seeks relief covered by the motion filed by Mr. Watts and the Watts Guerra firm. =(302/HEK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VAIL CONSULTING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DePuy Orthopaedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CABRASER ELIZABETH JOAN