This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 01:16:31 (UTC).

PATRICIA PLATH VS. TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2008 PATRICIA PLATH filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0101

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

MCKESSON CORPORATION

ZENITH GOLDLINE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC

WAL-MART STORES, INC

ZENITH GOLDLINE PHARMACEUTICALS

TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

ZENITH GOLDINE PHARMACEUTICALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREWS, ANNE

Attorney at ANDREWS & THORNTON

2 Corporate Park, Suite 110

Irvine, CA 92606

Defendant Attorneys

BRYAN, PATRICK M.

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

655-15Th St., N.W., Ste. 1200

Washington, DC 20005

FABIAN, SARAH B.

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

655-15Th St., N.W., Ste. 1200

Washington, DC 20005

KELOTRA, RITU

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

655-15Th St., N.W., Ste. 1200

Washington, DC 20005

LEVY, JENNIFER G.

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

655-15Th St., N.W., Ste. 1200

Washington, DC 20005

YASHAR, PANTEA M.

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

777 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

LA SCALA, PAUL B.

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY & BACON LLPJAMBOREE CENTER

5 Park Plaza, Ste 1600

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC ZENITH GOLDINE PHARMACEUTICALS MCKESSON CORPORATION WAL-MART STORES, INC DOES 1 THROUGH 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-20-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-24-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-05-2009 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:885.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED SEP-23-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES, INC

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED SEP-23-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES, INC (Fee:885.00)

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC MCKESSON CORPORATION WAL-MART STORES, INC ZENITH GOLDLINE PHARMACEUTICALS DOES 1 THROUGH 50

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED APPLICATION OF SARAH B. FABIAN FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION (NO S.A.S.E., COPY IN DEPT. 301 OUT BOX)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED APPLICATION OF RITU KELOTRA FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION (NO S.A.S.E., COPY IN DEPT. 301 OUT BOX)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED APPLICATION OF PATRICK M. BRYAN FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION (NO S.A.S.E., COPY IN DEPT. 301 OUT BOX)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JENNIFER G. LEVY FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION (NO S.A.S.E., COPY IN DEPT. 301 OUT BOX)

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (NO S.A.S.E., COPY IN 301 OUT BOX)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-20-2009 CONTINUED TO APR-17-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC MCKESSON CORPORATION WAL-MART STORES, INC ZENITH GOLDLINE PHARMACEUTICALS DOES 1 THROUGH 50

ORDER

ORDER - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING RESOLUTION OF JUDICIAL COORDINATION PETITION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2009 CONTINUED TO JUN-12-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR COORDINATION STATUS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-12-2009 CONTINUED TO AUG-14-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR COORDINATION STATUS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-14-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR COORDINATED UNDER JCCP 4565. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-14-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR COORDINATED UNDER JCCP 4565. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC MCKESSON CORPORATION TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ZENITH GOLDLINE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 21.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED ASSIGINING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PETITION FOR COORDINATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-12-2009 CONTINUED TO AUG-14-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR COORDINATION STATUS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2009 CONTINUED TO JUN-12-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR COORDINATION STATUS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC MCKESSON CORPORATION TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ZENITH GOLDLINE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 21.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 21.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE AND SETTING DATE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2008
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OF VERIFIED APPLICATION OF PATRICK M BRYAN FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION, PROOF OF SERVICE, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC MCKESSON CORPORATION TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ZENITH GOLDLINE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. HEARING SET FOR NOV-25-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2008
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OF VERIFIED APPLICATION OF RITU KELOTRA FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION, PROOF OF SERVICE, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC MCKESSON CORPORATION TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ZENITH GOLDLINE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. HEARING SET FOR NOV-25-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2008
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OF VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JENNIFER G LEVY FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION, PROOF OF SERVICE, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC MCKESSON CORPORATION TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ZENITH GOLDLINE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. HEARING SET FOR NOV-25-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEMURRER, MEMO OF P&A FILED BY DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC MCKESSON CORPORATION TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ZENITH GOLDLINE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. HEARING SET FOR NOV-21-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:3580.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES, INC (Fee:885.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED SEP-23-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED SEP-23-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLATH, PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC ZENITH GOLDINE PHARMACEUTICALS MCKESSON CORPORATION WAL-MART STORES, INC DOES 1 THROUGH 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-20-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-24-2008 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-05-2009 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:885.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IVAX PHARMACEUTICALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREWS, ANNE