This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/02/2016 at 00:00:33 (UTC).

PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE VS. REGAN CASTILLO et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2011 PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REGAN CASTILLO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9291

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

BETTCHER, LORI AN INDIVIDUAL

San Francisco, CA 94132

SHERRY, JULIE A AN INDIVIDUAL

Citrus Heights, CA 95610

KOUNG, SENNICA S AN INDIVIDUAL

San Francisco, CA 94132

RAITZ, RENEE AN INDIVIDUAL

San Francisco, CA 94132

SHERRY, SHELBY AN INDIVIDUAL

San Francisco, CA 94132

CONTRERAS, HENRY AN INDIVIDUAL

Oxnard, CA 93030

CASTILLO, REGAN AN INDIVIDUAL

San Francisco, CA 94132

KIM, MARLIYA C AN INDIVIDUAL

Modesto, CA 95351

CASTILLO, ROWINA R AN INDIVIDUAL

Glendale, CA 91206

CONTRERAS, TAMARA R AN INDIVIDUAL

San Francisco, CA 94132

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

San Francisco, CA 94132

RAITZ, KIRSTYN AN INDIVIDUAL

San Francisco, CA 94132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WASSERMAN, DAVID

Attorney at WASSERMAN-STERN

2960 Van Ness Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94109-1020

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-04-2011, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT ON DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT CASTILLO, REGAN AN INDIVIDUAL RAITZ, KIRSTYN AN INDIVIDUAL BETTCHER, LORI AN INDIVIDUAL SHERRY, SHELBY AN INDIVIDUAL CONTRERAS, TAMARA R AN INDIVIDUAL SHERRY, JULIE A AN INDIVIDUAL CASTILLO, ROWINA R AN INDIVIDUAL CONTRERAS, HENRY AN INDIVIDUAL KOUNG, SENNICA S AN INDIVIDUAL KIM, MARLIYA C AN INDIVIDUAL RAITZ, RENEE AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SHERRY, JULIE A AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:IFP)

DEMAND FOR JURY

DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT SHERRY, JULIE A AN INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CASTILLO, ROWINA R AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:IFP)

DEMAND FOR JURY

DEMAND FOR JURY AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT CONTRERAS, HENRY AN INDIVIDUAL

DEMAND FOR JURY

DEMAND FOR JURY AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT CASTILLO, REGAN AN INDIVIDUAL SHERRY, SHELBY AN INDIVIDUAL CONTRERAS, TAMARA R AN INDIVIDUAL KOUNG, SENNICA S AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-04-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SHERRY, SHELBY AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-07-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CASTILLO, REGAN AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-07-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT BETTCHER, LORI AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-07-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SHERRY, JULIE A AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-07-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CASTILLO, ROWINA R AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-07-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT KIM, MARLIYA C AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-07-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT RAITZ, RENEE AN INDIVIDUAL

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT RAITZ, KIRSTYN AN INDIVIDUAL BETTCHER, LORI AN INDIVIDUAL RAITZ, RENEE AN INDIVIDUAL

REQUEST TO SET FOR TRIAL

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY HEARING SET FOR FEB-27-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 501 ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Settlement Hearing

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR FEB-23-2012 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 501

NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION, U.D. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION, U.D. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT CASTILLO, REGAN AN INDIVIDUAL SHERRY, SHELBY AN INDIVIDUAL KOUNG, SENNICA S AN INDIVIDUAL ELLIS, GREGORY CODY ASSIGNED TO REPRESENT PARTY FOR U. D. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-23-2012 01:30 PM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION, U.D. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT CASTILLO, REGAN AN INDIVIDUAL SHERRY, SHELBY AN INDIVIDUAL KOUNG, SENNICA S AN INDIVIDUAL ELLIS, GREGORY CODY ASSIGNED TO REPRESENT PARTY FOR U. D. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • UD JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-27-2012 VACATED. CASE SETTLED AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. (501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD, CASE SETTLED. TRIAL DATE OF FEB-27-2012 VACATED. (501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR FEB-23-2012 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY HEARING SET FOR FEB-27-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 501 ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT RAITZ, KIRSTYN AN INDIVIDUAL BETTCHER, LORI AN INDIVIDUAL RAITZ, RENEE AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-07-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT RAITZ, RENEE AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-07-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT KIM, MARLIYA C AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEE AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT KOUNG, SENNICA S AN INDIVIDUAL ORDER FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEE AND EXPENSES GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT KOUNG, SENNICA S AN INDIVIDUAL ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEE AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT CASTILLO, REGAN AN INDIVIDUAL ORDER FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEE AND EXPENSES GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT CASTILLO, REGAN AN INDIVIDUAL ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEE AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONTRERAS, TAMARA R AN INDIVIDUAL ORDER FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEE AND EXPENSES GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONTRERAS, TAMARA R AN INDIVIDUAL ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEE AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHERRY, SHELBY AN INDIVIDUAL ORDER FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEE AND EXPENSES GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHERRY, SHELBY AN INDIVIDUAL ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PARKMERCED INVESTORS PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT CASTILLO, REGAN AN INDIVIDUAL RAITZ, KIRSTYN AN INDIVIDUAL BETTCHER, LORI AN INDIVIDUAL SHERRY, SHELBY AN INDIVIDUAL CONTRERAS, TAMARA R AN INDIVIDUAL SHERRY, JULIE A AN INDIVIDUAL CASTILLO, ROWINA R AN INDIVIDUAL CONTRERAS, HENRY AN INDIVIDUAL KOUNG, SENNICA S AN INDIVIDUAL KIM, MARLIYA C AN INDIVIDUAL RAITZ, RENEE AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less