Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/17/2016 at 03:29:20 (UTC).

PAMELA MOORE VS. BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2015 PAMELA MOORE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9048

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOORE, PAMELA , AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND THO

MOORE, PAMELA , AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY

DOES 1-50

GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTRIDE, ADAM

Attorney at GUTRIDE SAFIER LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

LAFAYETTE, GARY TRACY

Attorney at LAFAYETTE & KUMAGAI

101 Mission Street, Ste 600

San Francisco, CA 94105

MANOLIUS, KIMON

Attorney at HANSON BRIDGET LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

APPLICATION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION; REQUEST TO RELATE CASES

APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58246447) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORE, PAMELA , AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:60.00)

EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA V. ATENCIO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDA

EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA V. ATENCIO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58298473) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

EXHIBITS C AND D TO DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA V. ATENCIO IN SUPPORT OF

EXHIBITS C AND D TO DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA V. ATENCIO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GAE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLIANTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 58298473) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION C

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58341335) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY

COMBINED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIO

COMBINED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC. IN SUPPORT OF (1) MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS FIRST SET OF (A) REQUESTS TO IDENTIFY IN WRITING AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; (B) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; AND (C) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; (2) TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; AND (3) MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED, UNANSWERED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; AND (4) FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58672648) FILED BY DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC

Declaration of Nicole S. Witt in Support of Defendants Golden Gate Bri

DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763609) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Exhibit F In Support of Declaration of Nicole S. Witt in Support of De

EXHIBIT F IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763784) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC.S COMBINED AMENDED NOTI

COMBINED AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND (1) MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS FIRST SET OF: (A) REQUESTS TO IDENTIFY IN WRITING AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; (B) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; AND (C) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; (2) TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; AND (3) MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED, UNANSWERED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; AND (4) FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58767162) FILED BY DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC HEARING SET FOR APR-05-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 304 (Fee:NO FEE)

DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS ANS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58341270) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Order Granting Complex Designation and for Single Assignment

ORDER GRANTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION AND FOR SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE CURTIS KARNOW FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR FEB-10-2016 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 304. APR-20-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INCS COMBINED NOTICE OF MOT

DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INCS COMBINED NOTICE OF MOTION AND (1) MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS FIRST SET OF (A) REQUESTS TO IDENTIFY IN WRITING AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; (B) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; AND (C) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; (2) TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; AND (3) MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED, UNANSWERED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; AND (4) FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58672648) FILED BY DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC HEARING SET FOR MAR-30-2016 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT 304 (Fee:60.00)

ORDER

ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.5 (TRANSACTION #58732240)

NOTICE OF FILING OF APPLICATION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION; REQUEST

NOTICE OF FILING OF APPLICATION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION; REQUEST TO RELATE CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 58737807) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORE, PAMELA , AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants Golden Gate Bridge, Highway and Transportation District and

DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763609) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Exhibits A thru B In Support of Declaration of Nicole S. Witt in Suppo

EXHIBITS A THRU B IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763784) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

Exhibits C thru E In Support of Declaration of Nicole S. Witt in Suppo

EXHIBITS C THRU E IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763784) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC.S NOTICE WITHDRAWING IT

NOTICE WITHDRAWING ITS COMBINED MOTION (1)TO COMPEL FURTHER WRITTEN RESPONSES TO ITS FIRST SET OF: (A) REQUESTS TO IDENTIFY IN WRITING AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; (B) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; AND (C) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; (2) TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; AND (3) TO DEEM ADMITTED, UNANSWERED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; AND (4) FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58798899) FILED BY DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2016
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION CALENDAR ON APR-08-2016 IN DEPT. 304, COMPLEX LITIGATION OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION CALENDAR ON APR-05-2016 IN DEPT. 304, COMPLEX LITIGATION OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE WITHDRAWING ITS COMBINED MOTION (1)TO COMPEL FURTHER WRITTEN RESPONSES TO ITS FIRST SET OF: (A) REQUESTS TO IDENTIFY IN WRITING AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; (B) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; AND (C) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; (2) TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; AND (3) TO DEEM ADMITTED, UNANSWERED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; AND (4) FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58798899) FILED BY DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-30-2016 CONTINUED TO APR-08-2016 AT 3:30PM IN 304 AT REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • FEE PAID ON STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 58769697) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORE, PAMELA , AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMBINED AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND (1) MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS FIRST SET OF: (A) REQUESTS TO IDENTIFY IN WRITING AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; (B) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; AND (C) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; (2) TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; AND (3) MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED, UNANSWERED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; AND (4) FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58767162) FILED BY DEFENDANT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC HEARING SET FOR APR-05-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 304 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT F IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763784) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS C THRU E IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763784) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS A THRU B IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF NICOLE S. WITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763784) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58763609) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS JOINDER IN COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION (TRANSACTION ID # 58298473) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS C AND D TO DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA V. ATENCIO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GAE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLIANTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 58298473) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA V. ATENCIO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58298473) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA V. ATENCIO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 58298473) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA V. ATENCIO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICTS AND BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 58298473) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RELATE CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 58298473) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION REQUEST TO RELATE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58246447) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORE, PAMELA , AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58189379) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORE, PAMELA , AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORE, PAMELA , AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT BAY AREA TOLL AUTHORITY GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY AND TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT XEROX STATE AND LOCAL SOLUTIONS, INC DOES 1-50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-20-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-19-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-28-2016 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XEROX STATE & LOCAL SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAFAYETTE, GARY T