This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 10:53:28 (UTC).

PAMELA J. WHITEHEAD VS. STOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 PAMELA J WHITEHEAD filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against STOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO , INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN and TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4274

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITEHEAD, PAMELA J. AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE PAMELA J. WHITEHEAD FAMILY TRUST

Douglas, MI 49406

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

STOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAZZOLA, SIMON A

Attorney at THE MAZZOLA LAW OFFICE

1001 Bayhill Drive, Suite 200

San Bruno, CA 94066

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BRILLIANT, RACHEL K.

Attorney at MURCHISON & CUMMING, LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 850

San Francisco, CA 94111

LOWARY, MARK

Attorney at BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNEIDER & LOWARY, LLP

2390 Professional Dr.

Roseville, Ca., CA 95661

CROWLEY, DANIEL FRANCIS

Attorney at DANIEL CROWLEY & ASSOCIATES

3558 Round Barn Blvd., Suite 201

Santa Rosa, CA 95403

SIMS, BOB

Attorney at SIMS DIMALANTA LAWRENCE LLP

1891 E. Roseville Pkwy, Suite 180

Roseville, CA 95661

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-11-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61962741)

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WHITEHEAD, PAMELA J. AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE PAMELA J. WHITEHEAD FAMILY TRUST DATED OCTOBER 5, 2005 TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Order Setting Case Management Conference

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR ON APR-02-2018. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON JUL-11-2018 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR JUDGMENT AFTER ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED 03/01/18. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206)

NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61757132) FILED BY DEFENDANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration Of J Scott Miller In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgmen

DECLARATION OF J SCOTT MILLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100028070) FILED BY DEFENDANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC.

Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Motion F

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100028070) FILED BY DEFENDANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC.

Master List Of Exhibits In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment

MASTER LIST OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100028070) FILED BY DEFENDANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC.

Request for Dismissal of Cross Complaint

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 100034341)

NOTICE OF ORDER AND ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 61364228) FILED BY DEFENDANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC.

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

ORDER

ORDER DEEMING UNANSWERED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AS ADMITTED AND AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

ORDER

ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Stipulation for Trial Continuance

STIPULATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 61327923) FILED BY S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC. WHITEHEAD, PAMELA J. AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE PAMELA J. WHITEHEAD FAMILY TRUST DATED OCTOBER 5, 2005

Declaration of Katelyn M. Knight in Support of Ex Parte Application fo

DECLARATION OF KATELYN M. KNIGHT IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME (TRANSACTION ID # 61313897) FILED BY DEFENDANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Applicatio

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME (TRANSACTION ID # 61313897) FILED BY DEFENDANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC.

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2017
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1417C14R005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1417C14M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1517B02M024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1417A25M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1417A24M005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1417A24M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4917614R019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4917614M018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : X4517201J001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8017124J004

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60123676) FILED BY DEFENDANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100009507) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF WHITEHEAD, PAMELA J. AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE PAMELA J. WHITEHEAD FAMILY TRUST DATED OCTOBER 5, 2005 (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100009507) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WHITEHEAD, PAMELA J. AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE PAMELA J. WHITEHEAD FAMILY TRUST DATED OCTOBER 5, 2005 JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT TO CROSS COMPLAINANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16297043) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16297043) FILED BY DEFENDANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC. (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF WHITEHEAD, PAMELA J. AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE PAMELA J. WHITEHEAD FAMILY TRUST DATED OCTOBER 5, 2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • FEE FOR COMPLEX FOR PLAINTIFF FILED BY PLAINTIFF WHITEHEAD, PAMELA J. AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE PAMELA J. WHITEHEAD FAMILY TRUST DATED OCTOBER 5, 2005 (Fee:$1000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WHITEHEAD, PAMELA J. AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE PAMELA J. WHITEHEAD FAMILY TRUST DATED OCTOBER 5, 2005 AS TO DEFENDANT S'TOP HOME SERVICE ROOFING CO., INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-15-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-14-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-23-2017 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLIANT, RACHEL K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bob Sims

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CROWLEY, DANIEL FRANCIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOWARY MARK E. ESQ.