Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 02:13:13 (UTC).

PABLO PERILLO VS. PATRICIA LARIZADEH

Case Summary

On 09/22/2014 PABLO PERILLO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PATRICIA LARIZADEH. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2347

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PERILLO, PABLO

San Francisco, CA 94114

Respondent

LARIZADEH, PATRICIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2015
  • OFF CALENDAR, COMPLIED WITH CASE RESOLUTION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS MAR-24-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • *JUDGMENT REVIEWED BY DEFAULT CLERK AND SENT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER PERILLO, PABLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • STIPULATION AND MUTUAL WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • PRELIMINARY FINAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT LARIZADEH, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • PRELIMINARY FINAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER PERILLO, PABLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT LARIZADEH, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED SUBMITTED BY: PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: NOV-17-2014, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE: NOV-21-2014 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT ATTACHED FILED BY PETITIONER PERILLO, PABLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • AMENDED FAMILY LAW SUMMONS FILED BY PETITIONER PERILLO, PABLO AS TO RESPONDENT LARIZADEH, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER PERILLO, PABLO AS TO RESPONDENT LARIZADEH, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: SEP-23-2014 FILED BY PETITIONER PERILLO, PABLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • NOTICE OF NATURE OF AVAILABILITY OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION METHODS IN FAMILY LAW MATTERS FILED BY PETITIONER PERILLO, PABLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER PERILLO, PABLO AS TO RESPONDENT LARIZADEH, PATRICIA SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less