This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/25/2019 at 19:22:54 (UTC).

P. W. FU VS. JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2012 P W FU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JUDGE RICHARD B ULMER, JR. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN, LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR, CYNTHIA M. LEE, MARLA J. MILLER and KATHERINE FEINSTEIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3169

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR

CYNTHIA M. LEE

MARLA J. MILLER

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FU, P. W.1812 FRANCISCO STREET #GBERKELEY, CA 94703

FU, P. W.

Berkeley, CA 94703

Defendant

JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

COLWELL, KIMBERLY ELIZABETH

Attorney at MEYERS, NAVE, RIBACK, SILVER & WILSON

555 12Th St. Ste. 1500

Oakland, CA 94607

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-09-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: - JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING DATE FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W.

ORDER

ORDER DECLARING BOWAN FU (AKA: PO WAN FU, P.W. FU AND PW FU) A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT

ORDER

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER RECONSIDERATION HEARING

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

TO DISMISS FRIVOLOUS PREFILING ORDER FOR UNSUBSTANTIATED ACCUSATION OF VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W. SERVED AUG-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR. HEARING SET FOR OCT-01-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:EXEMPT)

NOTICE

NOTICE - COURT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PREFILING ORDER PREVENTING FILING BY VEXATIOUS LITIGANT

ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR RECONSIDERATION OF FEE WAIVER APPLICATION

ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR RECONSIDERATION OF FEE WAIVER APPLICATION HEARING SET FOR SEP-19-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 206

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W. SERVED AUG-15-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 HOURS

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W. AS TO DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-09-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-09-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-26-2012 (Fee:IFP)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2012
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : W1612904F018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Payment : CERTIFIED/EXEMPLIFIED COPIES; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : R1612815F012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Payment : CERTIFIED/EXEMPLIFIED COPIES; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : W7712815F016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Payment : CERTIFIED/EXEMPLIFIED COPIES; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : B7512815F005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : W1212810F025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-09-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED ON JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FILED BY DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: - JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - COURT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PREFILING ORDER PREVENTING FILING BY VEXATIOUS LITIGANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR RECONSIDERATION OF FEE WAIVER APPLICATION HEARING SET FOR SEP-19-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 206

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • COPYING FEES (4 PAGE) PAID BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W. (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W. SERVED AUG-15-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • COPYING FEES (16 PAGE) PAID BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W. (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • COPYING FEES (10 PAGE) PAID BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W. (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W. ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FU, P. W. AS TO DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-09-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-09-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-26-2012 (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******3169
Case Title:P. W. FU VS. JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.
Court Date:NOV-13-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, November 13, 2012, Line 27, DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT.Transferred to Department 624 to be heard by Judge O'Malley-Taylor on November 13, 2012 at 9:00 am. = (302/MJM)


Case Number:*******3169
Case Title:P. W. FU VS. JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.
Court Date:OCT-16-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, October 16, 2012, Line 19, DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT.Continued on the court's own motion to November 13, 2012. Judge Kahn has recused himself from this case. =(302/HEK)


Case Number:*******3169
Case Title:P. W. FU VS. JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.
Court Date:OCT-01-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Monday, October 1, 2012, Line 11, DEFENDANT JUDGE RICHARD B. ULMER, JR.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT.Continued on the court's own motion to October 16, 2012. Judge Kahn has recused himself from hearing any matters in this case. =(302/HEK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly E. Colwell