This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 13:08:47 (UTC).

OTTO GISLER VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2008 OTTO GISLER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are A. JAMES ROBERTSON II, GARRETT L. WONG, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, PANG LY, TERI L. JACKSON, HAROLD E. KAHN and SUZANNE R. BOLANOS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5012

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

GARRETT L. WONG

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

PANG LY

TERI L. JACKSON

HAROLD E. KAHN

SUZANNE R. BOLANOS

 

Party Details

Defendants

TRANE US INC. FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

GRAYSON ELECTRIC

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

J. T. THORPE & SON, INC.

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

WONGS AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES, INC.

DURO DAYNE CORPORATION

BRYAN STEAM CORPORATION AND NOT THE CLAIMS AGAINST "BRYAN STEAM, LLC"

CRANE CO.

DURO DYNE CORPORATION

THE H.B. SMITH COMPANY, INC.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

WISMER & BECKER CONTRACTING ENGINEERS

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

CONTINENTAL CONSTRUCTION

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

COWPERTHWAITE, JOHN GRAHAM

Attorney at BENNETT, SAMUELSEN, REYNOLDS & ALLARD, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1301 Marina Village Parkway, Ste 300

Alameda, CA 94501

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941052708

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

JUDIN, JENNIFER

Attorney at DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

1300 Clay Street, Ste 840

Oakland, CA 94612

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 945963759

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP; ATTORNEYS AT LAW

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 949486169

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

Attorney at MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

SHUEY, DAVID T

Attorney at RANKIN, SPROAT, MIRES, BEATY & REYNOLDSA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1970 Broadway, Suite 1150

Oakland,, CA 94612

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive,, Suite 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

JACOBS, JESSE

Attorney at COOLEY MANION JONES HAKE KUROWSKI LLP

201 Spear Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 946082604

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive, Ste 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94105

GAMBA, PAUL JOSEPH

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery St, 6Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF DANIEL W. FOX IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

DECLARATION OF DANIEL W. FOX IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLTFS' MO TO CONSOLIDATE (TRANSACTION ID # 41055455) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD.?S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 31892921) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.

DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.?S NOTICE OF MOTION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 31892921) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD. HEARING SET FOR SEP-16-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 220

Declaration of Trung V. Quach in Support of Defendant Metalclad Insulation Corporation?s Motion for Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues, Exhibits A - F

DECLARATION OF TRUNG V. QUACH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES, EXHIBITS A - F (TRANSACTION ID # 31706078) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

Defendant Metalclad Insulation Corporation?s Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues

DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 31706078) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

Defendant Metalclad Insulation Corporation?s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOSUM (TRANSACTION ID # 31706078) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

Notice of Metalclad Insulation Corporation?s Motion for Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 31706078) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR SEP-02-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 220

DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY- ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27917180) FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24308989) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 40807816) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35341322) AS TO DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS GRINNELL CORPORATION

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO ACTUAL OR POTENTIAL DOLLAR AMOUNTS DURING VOIR DIRE

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO ACTUAL OR POTENTIAL DOLLAR AMOUNTS DURING VOIR DIRE (TRANSACTION ID # 33721562) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM EXCEPT FOR EXPERTS

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM EXCEPT FOR EXPERTS (TRANSACTION ID # 33721562) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

WISMER & BECKER CONTRACTING ENGINEERS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE RE BANKRUPT|INSOLVENT DEFENDANTS - Motion In Limine No. 17

WISMER BECKER CONTRACTING ENGINEERS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE THE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE RE BANKRUPT|INSOLVENT DEFENDANTS - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17 (TRANSACTION ID # 33687598) FILED BY DEFENDANT WISMER & BECKER CONTRACTING ENGINEERS

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS' TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1-3 ' 1001

Notice of Change of Address (on behalf of Calaveras)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 32115243) FILED BY ATTORNEY SHARP, GARY D

Substitution of Attorney

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 30850176): JUDIN, JENNIFER SUBSTITUTED FOR FONG, CAMILLE KAMEE AS ATTORNEY FOR KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 30562374) AS TO DEFENDANT BRYAN STEAM CORPORATION AND NOT THE CLAIMS AGAINST "BRYAN STEAM, LLC" BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. CENTURY FIBER GLASS CORPORATION CONTINENTAL CONSTRUCTION GRAYSON ELECTRIC HELLER " CAMPBELL OTTO, JOHN UNIVAC WONGS AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES, INC.

287 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2011
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5211510S004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5210A28M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $370; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4910A22F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W3610923J024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1610923J017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2010
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4910922J007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $370; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4910826F016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4910714M028

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4910709M009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5210708M002

    Read MoreRead Less
413 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL. (TRANSACTION ID # 24010275) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24010275) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION (Fee:$365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23983842) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:$365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLINATION OF STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 23938414) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23938414) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC. (Fee:$365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23926879) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION (Fee:$365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23893333) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (Fee:$365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF GISLER, OTTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GISLER, OTTO AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-17-2009 (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less