This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 12:03:25 (UTC).

Onomen Odiahi Vs. Douglas Fernando Rodriguez Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by Onomen Odiahi against Douglas Fernando Rodriguez in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4327

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Teri L. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Odiahi, Onomen

Defendants

Does 1 To 20

Rodriguez, Douglas Fernando

Lazo, Hermes Ovidio Tovar

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

Notice of Entry Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 100046733) FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100050217) FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-13-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-24-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Arbitration

ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR SEP-17-2018. THE JUL-18-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Random Selection From Panel of Arbitrators

PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE SEP-27-2018.

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ODIAHI, ONOMEN AS TO DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

POS Onomen 1

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037993), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ODIAHI, ONOMEN SERVED MAR-21-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041318) FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY AND REMOVE CASE FROM LIST OF CASES ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037325) FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR

Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 100039427) FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR

CMC Onomen

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041559) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ODIAHI, ONOMEN ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET 1: FOR AN AWARD OF MONETAR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,020.0 AGAINST PLAINTIFF, ONOMEN ODIAHI AND HIS STTORNEY OF RECORD MICHAEL O. AKHIDENOR, ESQ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GENE STONE IN SUPPORT THEREOF; SEPARATE STAMENT OF DISPUTED QUESTIONS AND ANSWERS (TRANSACTION ID # 100042165) FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR HEARING SET FOR AUG-20-2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302

PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO DETERMINE AMOUNT IN CO

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO DETERMINE AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY AND REMOVE CASE FROM LIST OF CASES ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO CCP 114.11(A) (TRANSACTION ID # 100048274) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ODIAHI, ONOMEN

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A JUDGE PRO TEM.

Order Setting Case Management Conference

REMOVED FROM ARBITRATION. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCT-24-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : B4918918M007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W0918719M015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4918614J023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1418515F012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : W1518214F018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-13-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-24-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100050217) FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM ARBITRATION. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCT-24-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY AND REMOVE CASE FROM LIST OF CASES ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO DETERMINE AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY AND REMOVE CASE FROM LIST OF CASES ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO CCP 114.11(A) (TRANSACTION ID # 100048274) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ODIAHI, ONOMEN (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041559) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ODIAHI, ONOMEN ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR SEP-17-2018. THE JUL-18-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041318) FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 100039427) FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100039427) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037993), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ODIAHI, ONOMEN SERVED MAR-21-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037325) FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ODIAHI, ONOMEN ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ODIAHI, ONOMEN AS TO DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ, DOUGLAS FERNANDO LAZO, HERMES OVIDIO TOVAR DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.