This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:26:40 (UTC).

OLA MAE BILLS et al VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2007 OLA MAE BILLS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4389

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HORNE, DENNY , AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVY LEE BILLS, DECEASED

REZA, SANDRA , AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVY LEE BILLS, DECEASED

COPPA, CINDY , AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVY LEE BILLS, DECEASED

Defendants

FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

THE OCEANIC STEAMSHIP COMPANY

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

DOES 1-820

NOMELLINI CONSTRUCTION CO.

KAISER GYSUM COMPANY, INC.

DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

GRINNELL CORPORATION

MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.

OTHER ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANLEY, DEAN A

Attorney at PAUL HANLEY & HARLEY LLP

1608 Fourth Street, Suite 300

Berkeley, CA 94710

Defendant Attorneys

CONWAY, PATRICIA KANTOR

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 4Th Street, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

LOPEZ, RONALD FRANK

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY

One Embarcadero Ctr., 18 Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3600

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

STEINHEIMER, M. MAX

Attorney at DOWNEY BRAND LLP

3425 Brookside, Ste. A

Stockton, CA 95219

MCDANIEL, DANIEL A

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Center,, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111-3941

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

ALLEN, JASON B.

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market Street, Spear Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

PORT, ANDREW IRA

Attorney at EMARD, DANNOFF, PORT, TAMULSKI & PAETZOLD, LLP

49 Stevenson Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94105

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

FOX, GERARD P.

Attorney at LINER YANKELEVITS SUNSHINE & REGENSTREIF LLP

199 Fremont St, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

Attorney at STEEFEL LEVITT & WEISS

1 Embarcadero Ctr 29Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

KEENEY, ROBERT CHARLES

Attorney at IMAI, TADLOCK, KEENEY & CORDERY LLP

100 Bush St Ste 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

MARGOLES, LAWRENCE A

Attorney at DRYDEN, MARGOLES, SCHIMANECK & WERTZ

101 California St, Suite 2050

San Francisco, CA 94111

LYMAN, ROBERT JOSEPH

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119

Oakland, CA 94604

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

HARTWELL, MORTIMER H

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INCS DECLINATION OF STIPULATION OF HEARINGS BY COMMISSIONER

DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INCS DECLINATION OF STIPULATION OF HEARINGS BY COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 16673840) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.

Defendant Grinnell LLCs Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Survival, Wrongful Death and Loss of Consortium - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16725405) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS GRINNELL CORP.) (Fee:335.00)

Defendant FDCC California, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Survival Wrongful Death and Loss of Consortium-Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16854747) FILED BY DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC. (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL - WRONGFUL DEATH AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16869890) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16884958) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16892178) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

Defendant Nomellini Construction Co.s Demand for Jury Trial

DEFENDANT NOMELLINI CONSTRUCTION CO.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 17516045) FILED BY DEFENDANT NOMELLINI CONSTRUCTION CO.

Substitution of Attorney - Civil (Without Court Order)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 17942837): STEINHEIMER, M. MAX SUBSTITUTED FOR MCDANIEL, DANIEL A AS ATTORNEY FOR NOMELLINI CONSTRUCTION CO.

Notice of Law Firm Name Change

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 18517430) FILED BY ATTORNEY LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PIERCE LATHING COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 23763511) FILED BY DEFENDANT PIERCE LATHING COMPANY DBA PIERCE ENTERPRISES

DEFENDANT PIERCE LATHING COMPANYS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 23763511) FILED BY DEFENDANT PIERCE LATHING COMPANY DBA PIERCE ENTERPRISES

DECLARATION OF KRISTI K. OKUMOTO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PIERCE LATHING COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF KRISTI K. OKUMOTO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 23763511) FILED BY DEFENDANT PIERCE LATHING COMPANY DBA PIERCE ENTERPRISES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 23883541) IN SUPP OF GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC'S MO FOR SUM JUDGT FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF DIANE T. GORCZYCA IN SUPPORT O GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF DIANE T. GORCZYCA IN SUPPORT O GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 23883541) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 23883541) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Georgia-Pacific LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 23900815) IN SUPP OF MO FOR SUM JUDGT FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

Defendant FDCC California Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Louis R. Barella; Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 24206394) FILED BY DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAY-08-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:200.00)

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 24206394) FILED BY DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

128 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27550822) AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • MASTER JURY ASBESTOS CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-22-2009 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2009
  • MASTER JURY ASBESTOS CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-20-2009 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS (CONTINUED) ON JUL-22-2009 AT 9:30 AM IN 206 FOR PROOF OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. ATTY. SWANSON REPRESENTED TO THE COURT THAT THIS CASE HAS FULLY RESOLVED. JUDGE: JAMES J. MCBRIDE; CLERK: R. VELUZ; REPORTER: HELEN SOREP-MATLEY, CSR #9225 (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 26191832)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 26050626) AS TO DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED IN U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT OF SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (TRANSACTION ID # 25559366) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • MASTER JURY ASBESTOS CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-08-2009 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS ON JUL-20-2009 AT 11:15 AM IN 206 ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION AND OSC RE DISMISSAL AS TO ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD. JUDGE: JAMES MCBRIDE; CLERK: R. VELUZ; REPORTER: LAURA MARTINEZ, CSR# 11332 (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • CASE IS DISMISSED AS TO DOES 1-820 PER COURT'S ORDER AT HEARING ON JUN-08-2009. JUDGE: JAMES MCBRIDE; CLERK: R. VELUZ; REPORTER: LAURA MARTINEZ, CSR# 11332 (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • ASBESTOS MOTION CALENDAR ON MAY-19-2009 IN DEPT. 206, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS IN PAUL HANLEY GROUP 94 FOR TRIAL. OFF CALENDAR MOTION IS MOOT, THE MAHAR ACTION IS DISMISSED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
137 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16836365) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16836365) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16836365) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16831233) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16818772) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16725405) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS GRINNELL CORP.) (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INCS DECLINATION OF STIPULATION OF HEARINGS BY COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 16673840) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16673840) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BILLS, OLA MAE , INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN-IN-INTEREST TO DAVY LEE BILLS, DECEASED BILLS, OLA MAE , AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVY LEE BILLS, DECEASED BILLS JR., DAVY , AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVY LEE BILLS, DECEASED COPPA, CINDY , AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVY LEE BILLS, DECEASED HORNE, DENNY , AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVY LEE BILLS, DECEASED REZA, SANDRA , AS LEGAL HEIR OF DAVY LEE BILLS, DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD. OTHER ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-820 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-20-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less