This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 14:39:39 (UTC).

NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY VS. THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9578

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY

Defendants

SHELL OIL COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS SHELL CHEMICAL COMPANY

J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY

FMC CORPORATION

THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 300, INCLUSIVE

TRICAL INC,

PUREGRO COMPANY

NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS, INC.

WILBUR-ELLIS COMPANY LLC

SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISKE, JOHN PAUL

Attorney at BARON & BUDD, P.C.

11440 West Bernardo Court, Ste 265

San Diego, CA 92127

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

TOXIC TORT/ENVIRONMENT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY SHELL OIL COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS SHELL CHEMICAL COMPANY OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION WILBUR-ELLIS COMPANY LLC J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY FMC CORPORATION PUREGRO COMPANY NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS, INC. SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY TRICAL INC, DOES 1 TO 300, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-21-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-19-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-28-2021 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE **SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR ADDITIONAL CASES** FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-19-2021, ELECTRONIC AS TO DEFENDANT J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-18-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PUREGRO COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS SHELL CHEMICAL COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-18-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT WILBUR-ELLIS COMPANY LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-19-2021, ELECTRONIC AS TO DEFENDANT TRICAL INC,

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-22-2021 AS TO DEFENDANT SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-22-2021 AS TO DEFENDANT SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-19-2021, ELECTRONIC AS TO DEFENDANT TRICAL INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-18-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT WILBUR-ELLIS COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS SHELL CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-18-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PUREGRO COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-19-2021, ELECTRONIC AS TO DEFENDANT J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CRC 3.300; STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR); NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF., PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY SERVED FEB-22-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE **SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR ADDITIONAL CASES** FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0921216F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTOXIC TORT/ENVIRONMENT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NORTH KRANENBURG WATER SYSTEM MUTUAL WATER COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY SHELL OIL COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS SHELL CHEMICAL COMPANY OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION WILBUR-ELLIS COMPANY LLC J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY FMC CORPORATION PUREGRO COMPANY NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS, INC. SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY TRICAL INC, DOES 1 TO 300, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-21-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-19-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-28-2021 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Puregro Company is a litigant

Latest cases where J.R. Simplot Foundation, Inc. is a litigant