This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 01:46:08 (UTC).

NORMAN B. PIKE VS. RECOLOGY INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 NORMAN B PIKE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RECOLOGY INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GARRETT L. WONG, SAMUEL K. FENG, RICHARD B. ULMER and ETHAN P. SCHULMAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8741

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

GARRETT L. WONG

SAMUEL K. FENG

RICHARD B. ULMER

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

RECOLOGY INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RECOLOGY INC.

RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER

SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY A.K.A. RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARET, PHILLIP ALLEN

Attorney at JARET & JARET

1016 Lincoln Avenue

San Rafael, CA 94901

Defendant Attorney

WALT, JENNIFER JOAN

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

333 Bush Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 66303634) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66303634)

Notice Of Settlement Of Entire Of Case

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022845) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66188675) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

DECLARATION OF EMILY A. MERTES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

DECLARATION OF EMILY A. MERTES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OF JULIE BERTANI-KISER (TRANSACTION ID # 66188675) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

DECLARATION OF JULIE BERTANI-KISER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE

DECLARATION OF JULIE BERTANI-KISER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OF JULIE BERTANI-KISER (TRANSACTION ID # 66188675) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OF JULIE BERTANI-KISER (TRANSACTION ID # 66188675) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DEPOS

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OF JULIE BERTANI-KISER (TRANSACTION ID # 66188675) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JAN-14-2021 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJ

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66085090) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66085031) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDAN

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66085031) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

DEFENDANTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66085031) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66085031) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JAN-22-2021 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66072650) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

ANSWER BY DEFENDANTS RECOLOGY INC., RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO, SUNSET SCA

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66072650) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200016716), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED SEP-18-2020, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE SEP-18-2020 AS TO DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE DISPOSAL & RECYCLING COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200016716), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED SEP-18-2020, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE SEP-18-2020 AS TO DEFENDANT SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY A.K.A. RECOLOGY SUNSET SCAVENGER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar Feb-18-2021 Vacated; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-22-2021 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED 2/2/21. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 66303634) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66303634)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION Off Calendar Jan-13-2021 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: RICHARD B. ULMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): Defendants' Notice Of Motion And Motion For Protective Order Re: Deposition Of Julie Bertani-Kiser Off Calendar Jan-13-2021 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION DEPT. 302 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, PREVIOUSLY SET FOR HEARING ON JAN-22-2021, IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY, EMAIL DATED 1/11/2021. = L&M302/JRM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION DEPT. 302 - DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OF JULIE BERTANI-KISER, PREVIOUSLY SET FOR HEARING ON JAN-14-2021, IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY, EMAIL DATED 1/11/2021. = L&M302/JRM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200022845) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialPayment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : H3320C15E030

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100090105) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100090105) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:$000000*)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5219B15F015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100088798) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:$900.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100086765), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED OCT-11-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100086765), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED OCT-11-2019, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE OCT-11-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100082760) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R9219828F001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIKE, NORMAN B. , AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-29-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-28-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-06-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less