This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/24/2023 at 06:24:35 (UTC).

NICHOLAS BOICOURT VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2009 NICHOLAS BOICOURT filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GARRETT L. WONG, TERI L. JACKSON, LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR, HAROLD E. KAHN and JAMES J. MCBRIDE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5331

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

GARRETT L. WONG

TERI L. JACKSON

LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR

HAROLD E. KAHN

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

 

Party Details

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM INC., SBM TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

MAREMONT CORPORATION

GATKE CORPORATION

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

PIERCE ENGINEERING COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS PIERCE ENGINEERING CO.

UNIVERSAL FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY

BECHTEL CORPORATION (DE) AND NOT THE CLAIMS AGAINST SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

UNION OIL OF CALIFORNIA AND NOT THE CLAIMS STATED AGAINST UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

ASBESTOS MANUFACTURING COMPANY

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

70 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

REYEN, KEITH PATRICK

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

HUGO, EDWARD R

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

ZACHER, PAUL GERHARDT

DONADIO, DAVID R

DUFFY, JOSEPH

SHELDON, CHARLES T

GOETZ, ANDY J.

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

MROZ, SCOTT DAVID

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

JUDIN, JENNIFER

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

COOK, PHILIP E

KRAFT, ROBERT S

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 41170897) FILED BY ATTORNEY JUDIN, JENNIFER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER VACATING AND CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER VACATING AND CONTINUING TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 37481060) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOICOURT, NICHOLAS (Fee:40.00)

DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27930964) FILED BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

DECLARATION OF HANS C. RUSCHKE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF HANS C. RUSCHKE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 44940589) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

Answer of Defendant Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Successor to Amchem Products, Inc. to Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27908553) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC. SUCCESSOR TO AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC. (Fee:370.00)

DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.S OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL

DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.S OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 28209745) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO TO STAY (TRANSACTION ID # 45350253) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 1001-5

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 37796808) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 AND 1001 TO BE SANTA FE BRAUN, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO C.F. BRAUN, INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 AND 1002 TO BE CARROLL DUNCAN & CO. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 3 AND 1003 TO BE C.F. BOLSTER COMPANY DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 4 AND 1004 TO BE PIERCE ENGINEERING CO. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 5 TO BE KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT (TRANSACTION ID # 27912530) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM INC., SBM TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

215 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62777081) AS TO DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Aug-26-2016 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-01-2016. DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED ON 8/4/16. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59375682)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jul-07-2016 Continued To Sep-01-16 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-04-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-01-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 58076415) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, KIMBERLY CHU. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Aug-06-2015 Continued To Aug-04-16 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-02-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, ATTY. JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
343 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27616090) FILED BY DEFENDANT RILEY POWER INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALTERNATE ENTITY OF BABCOCK BORSIG POWER, INC.; UNION BOILER COMPANY; UNION IRON WORKS, INC.; DB RILEY, INC.; RILEY STOKER CORPORATION; BADENHAUSEN; UNION IRON WORKS; AND UNION IRON WORKS OF SPOKANE, WA; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $370; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B5209A15F009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $370; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B1009A13F007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 27526063) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27526063) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27481980) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NES FILING ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOICOURT, NICHOLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $370; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1009831F036

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOICOURT, NICHOLAS AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, G, H, I, J, N ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1 TO 8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-19-2010; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5331
Case Title:NICHOLAS BOICOURT VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al
Court Date:AUG-09-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Stay
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, August 9, 2012 in Department 503 at 9:30 a.m., Line 16. Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Co., Inc.u00BFs motion to stay is off calendar as a duplicate entry. = (503/TLJ)