Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 02:44:45 (UTC).

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY VS. ALL BAY DRILLING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/12/2011 NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALL BAY DRILLING, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2430

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Defendants

MCKINLEY SHAW

P.J.'S LUMBER, INC. DOING BUSINESS AS P.J.'S REBAR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SPECIALTY WAREHOUSE, INC.

BOLEX, LLC

ALL BAY DRILLING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

BOLEX, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TOOLUP.COM, A NEVADA CORPORATION

SHAMROCK MATERIALS, INC.

CAL-CON PUMPING, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CURRAN, JAMES DAVID

Attorney at WOLKIN CURRAN LLP

555 Montgomery St., Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

JUNGREIS, JASON Z

Attorney at JUNGREIS LAW

760 Market Street Suite 753

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-16-2012 CONTINUED TO JUN-29-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-29-2012 CONTINUED TO OCT-31-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION SERVED JUL-20-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT P.J.'S LUMBER, INC. DOING BUSINESS AS P.J.'S REBAR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE MCKINLEY SHAW DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE SHAMROCK MATERIALS, INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 3 TO BE SPECIALTY WAREHOUSE, INC.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MCKINLEY SHAW

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-10-2011 CONTINUED TO JAN-13-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT SPECIALTY WAREHOUSE, INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-13-2012 CONTINUED TO MAR-16-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT CAL-CON PUMPING, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT BOLEX, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MITON FOR DISCHARGE FROM INTERPLEADER ACTION BY NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR JUL-18-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEEMNT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (WITH FEE)

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF BOLEX, LLC AND FOR ORDER OF PAYMENT OF INTERPLEADER CLAIMS FILED BY DEFENDANT BOLEX, LLC (Fee:370.00)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-31-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSED PER AUG-22-2012 ORDER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR DISCHARGE FROM INTERPLEADER ACTION IS OFF CALENDAR PER STIPULATION. THE STIPULATION & ORDER RE: DEFENDANT BOLEX WAS SIGNED. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; COURT REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER CSR # 5976

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-22-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF BOLEX, LLC AND FOR ORDER OF PAYMENT OF INTERPLEADER CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF GARY E. LOONEY IN SUPPORTOF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR MONETARY SACNTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF BOLEX, LLC AND FOR ORDER OF PAYMENT OF INTERPLEADER CLAIMS FILED BY DEFENDANT BOLEX, LLC (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR DISCHARGE FROM INTERPLEADER ACTION BY NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY IS CONTINUED TO AUGUST 22, 2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 302 PER THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER CSR #5976

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-18-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE MCKINLEY SHAW DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE SHAMROCK MATERIALS, INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 3 TO BE SPECIALTY WAREHOUSE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO FILE AMENDMENT TO COMPLAIN TIN INTERPLEADER NAMING DOE 1-3;, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT ALL BAY DRILLING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION SERVED SEP-07-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TOOLUP.COM, A NEVADA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION SERVED JUL-20-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT P.J.'S LUMBER, INC. DOING BUSINESS AS P.J.'S REBAR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ATTACHED, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION SERVED AUG-02-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CAL-CON PUMPING, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION SERVED AUG-29-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT ALL BAY DRILLING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ATTACHED, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION SERVED JUL-18-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT BOLEX, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT ALL BAY DRILLING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION P.J.'S LUMBER, INC. DOING BUSINESS AS P.J.'S REBAR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAL-CON PUMPING, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY TOOLUP.COM, A NEVADA CORPORATION BOLEX, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-10-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-12-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-26-2011 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant