Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 09:30:07 (UTC).

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4, A VS. MICHAEL R DWYER ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4, A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL R DWYER. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMUEL K. FENG and GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4251

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

SAMUEL K. FENG

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST (S)

Defendants

DWYER, MICHAEL R

DOES 1 TO 15

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOULANGER, MICHAEL R

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC

4545 Murphy Canyon Rd

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-15-2021 CONTINUED TO OCT-19-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-16-2021 CONTINUED TO JUN-15-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-12-2021 CONTINUED TO MAR-16-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-15-2020 CONTINUED TO JAN-12-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-21-2020 CONTINUED TO SEP-15-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-09-2020 CONTINUED TO JUL-21-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR JUN-09-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JUN-11-2019 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Settlement

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION [CONDITIONAL - APR-27-2020] (TRANSACTION ID # 63338382) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST (S)

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-23-2019 CONTINUED TO JUN-11-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Stipulated Settlement Agreement

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63186370) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST (S) ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT DWYER, MICHAEL R

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-23-2019 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18099029), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST (S) SERVED MAR-06-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAR-07-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT DWYER, MICHAEL R

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST (S) AS TO DEFENDANT DWYER, MICHAEL R DOES 1 TO 15 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-08-2018

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jun-01-2021 Continued To Oct-19-21 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-15-2021 CONTINUED TO OCT-19-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Mar-02-2021 Continued To Jun-15-21 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-16-2021 CONTINUED TO JUN-15-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Dec-31-2020 Continued To Mar-16-21 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-12-2021 CONTINUED TO MAR-16-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Sep-02-2020 Continued To Jan-12-21 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-15-2020 CONTINUED TO JAN-12-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jul-01-2020 Continued To Sep-15-20 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION [CONDITIONAL - APR-27-2020] (TRANSACTION ID # 63338382) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST (S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • FinancialPayment : FIRST PAPER RESPONSE/PLEADING $10,001 - $25,000; Amount : $370; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R5419423F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • HearingMatter(s): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Apr-22-2019 Continued To Jun-11-19 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-23-2019 CONTINUED TO JUN-11-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63186370) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST (S) ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT DWYER, MICHAEL R (Fee:$370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-23-2019 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCRC 3.740 REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18099029), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST (S) SERVED MAR-06-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE MAR-07-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT DWYER, MICHAEL R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • FinancialPayment : COMPLAINT/PETITION/FIRST PAPER; Amount : $370; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0818209F023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST (S) AS TO DEFENDANT DWYER, MICHAEL R DOES 1 TO 15 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-08-2018 (Fee:$370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005 2 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOULANGER MICHAEL R.