This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 09:29:53 (UTC).

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 200-2 A VS. JAMES MAHONEY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 200-2 A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMES MAHONEY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4250

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2004-2 A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST(S)

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 15

MAHONEY, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOULANGER, MICHAEL R

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC

4545 Murphy Canyon Rd

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-25-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62455450)

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-25-2018 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2004-2 A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST(S) AS TO DEFENDANT MAHONEY, JAMES DOES 1 TO 15 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-08-2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • HearingMatter(s): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Sep-21-2018 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-25-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62455450)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-25-2018 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • FinancialPayment : COMPLAINT/PETITION/FIRST PAPER; Amount : $370; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0818209F022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2004-2 A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST(S) AS TO DEFENDANT MAHONEY, JAMES DOES 1 TO 15 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-08-2018 (Fee:$370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005 2 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOULANGER MICHAEL R.