Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/17/2016 at 01:39:16 (UTC).

MONTE HANEY VS. T. MICHAEL YUEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/21/2015 MONTE HANEY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against T MICHAEL YUEN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8554

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANEY, MONTE

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 4

YUEN, T. MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DRAKE, KIMBERLY M.

Attorney at JARVIS, FAY, DOPORTO & GIBSON, LLP

492 Ninth St Ste 310

Oakland, CA 94607

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HANEY, MONTE AS TO DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL DOES 1 TO 4 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-23-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-21-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-29-2016 (Fee:IFP)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Notice of Hearing on Demurrer to Complaint

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15306036) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

Demurrer to Complaint

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15306036) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL HEARING SET FOR APR-04-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:EXEMPT)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer to Complai

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15306036) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer to Complaint

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15306036) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

Amended Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer to Complain

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (AMENDED) (TRANSACTION ID # 15307010) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTION TO DEFT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT CCP 430.20 FILED BY PLAINTIFF HANEY, MONTE

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-23-2016 CONTINUED TO MAY-25-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Defendants Reply Brief in Support of Demurrer to Complaint

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16082032) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants Reply Brief on De

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16082032) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

MINUTES FOR APR-08-2016 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR APR-08-2016 9:00 AM

Notice of Entry of Order Sustaining Demurrer to Complaint Without Leav

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND (TRANSACTION ID # 16102017) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND (TRANSACTION ID # 16102017) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR APR-08-2016 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON APR-08-2016 IN 505, DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS ORDERED SUSTAINED; DEFENDANT'S REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ARE GRANTED BY THE COURT; THE COURT SIGNS THE ORDER IN OPEN COURT; SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT. JUDGE: VJ HON. LESLIE C. NICHOLS; CLERK: MARJORIE L. MANZELLA; NOT REPORTED (DEPT. 505).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • LAW AND MOTION 302,DEFENDANT T. MICHAEL YUEN'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WILL BE HEARD BY VISITING JUDGE LESLIE NICHOLS ON APRIL 8, 2016 AT 9;00 A.M., IN DEPARTMENT 505. JUDGE: JUDGE KAHN. CLERK: ROSIE NOGUERA. REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR #5976. (302/HK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-04-2016 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16082032) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16082032) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-23-2016 CONTINUED TO MAY-25-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO DEFT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT CCP 430.20 FILED BY PLAINTIFF HANEY, MONTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (AMENDED) (TRANSACTION ID # 15307010) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 15306036) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15306036) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15306036) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15306036) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL HEARING SET FOR APR-04-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15306036) FILED BY DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HANEY, MONTE ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HANEY, MONTE AS TO DEFENDANT YUEN, T. MICHAEL DOES 1 TO 4 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-23-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-21-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-29-2016 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less