This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 01:05:33 (UTC).

MOHAMMED SAMER JABRI VS. SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 MOHAMMED SAMER JABRI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2481

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER

Defendants

CABRAL, RICARDO

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOES 1 TO 60

SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOETHALS, JOSEPH M

Attorney at ANDERLINI & MCSWEENEY LLP

66 Bovet Road, Suite 285

San Mateo, CA 94402

Defendant Attorney

LAYNE, WILLIAM M.

Attorney at CITY ATTORNEY

1390 Market St 6Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 941025408

 

Court Documents

Complaint (first appearance fee) (Case Initiation)

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210018923) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO CABRAL, RICARDO DOES 1 TO 60 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-22-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-19-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-27-2023

Civil Case Coversheet (Cover Sheets)

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210018923) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Issued Summons (Summons)

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210018923) TO PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER

Proof of Service - San Francisco Municipal Transportation Agency (Proo

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210021753) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER SERVED NOV-09-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

Proof of Service - City and County of San Francisco (Proof of Service)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210021753) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER SERVED NOV-09-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AS T

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AS TRIAL JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Notice of Remote Appearance

NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Case Management Statement (Statements)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210029668) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-22-2023 CONTINUED TO MAY-03-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Feb-27-2023 Continued To May-03-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-22-2023 CONTINUED TO MAY-03-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210029668) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialPayment: JURY FEES; Amount: $150; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: H2423131J004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketJURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO; Fee: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Payment Type: EXEMPT; Receipt Number: C5022C08F001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AS TRIAL JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68533008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO; Fee: EXEMPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210021753) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER SERVED NOV-09-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210021753) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER SERVED NOV-09-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210018923) TO PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H2522A25F001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210018923) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210018923) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JABRI, MOHAMMED SAMER AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO CABRAL, RICARDO DOES 1 TO 60 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-22-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-19-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-27-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less