Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 11:46:49 (UTC).

MOHAMED M. HOSNY VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2010 MOHAMED M HOSNY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4806

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOSNY, MOHAMED M.

Defendants

MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOES 1 THRU 5, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS, RICHARD MARTIN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD M ROGERS

100 Bush St #1980

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

OFIERSKI, RAFAL

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEYFOX PLAZA

1390 Market St, 5Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94102

BAUMGARTNER, MARGARET WATRY

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-09-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-23-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 218. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE TO FEB-13-12, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

MOTIONS IN LIMINE

MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOSNY, MOHAMED M.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF KATE FAVETTI FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF LAURA DANCERDF FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF TAMMY WONG FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF JAMES CERENIO FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

MOTIONS IN LIMINE

5 MOTIONS IN LIMINE FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF RAFAL OFIERSKI FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF MARIANA VALDEZ FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

EXHIBIT LIST

EXHIBIT LIST PLAINTIFF'S

EXHIBIT LIST

EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANT'S

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

CCSF'S OPPOSITION TO TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE PRODUCTION OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY AS TO PLAINTIFF HOSNY, MOHAMED M.

MINUTES FOR FEB-15-2012 2:15 PM

MINUTES FOR FEB-15-2012 2:15 PM FOR DEPT 306

MINUTES FOR FEB-17-2012 9:30 AM

MINUTES FOR FEB-17-2012 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 306

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2012
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2011B28J005 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • REMOVED FROM JURY TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-31-2012 - DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED OCT-12-2012. (306)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-31-2012 CONTINUED TO OCT-31-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN 306 FOR SETTLEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE AS REQUESTED BY CITY ATTORNEY AND UNOPPOSED BY PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED IF THE CASE IS DISMISSED. CLERK D306 551-3846

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE RE: STSUS OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-31-2012 CONTINUED TO AUG-31-2012 AT 9:00 AM IN 306 FOR STATUS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, RICHARD M. ROGERS, ESQ. IF A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION IS ON FILE PRIOR TO THE HEARING DATE, THIS MATTER WILL GO OFF CALENDAR. CLERK: DON FEINBERG, D306 551-3846

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PLTFS STATEMENT RE: SETTLEMENT HEARING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOSNY, MOHAMED M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • JURY TRIAL SET FOR FEB-23-2012 - CASE SETTLED - JUDGE: CYNTHIA MING-MEI LEE; CLERK: DON FEINBERG; REPORTER: JOE VICKSTEIN. CONTINUED TO MAY-31-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN 306 FOR VERIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL. IF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION IS FILED BEFORE 5-31-12; THE CASE WILL BE TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AND COUNSEL WILL NOT NEED TO APPEAR. COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO NOTIFY THE CLERK OF DEPT 306 UPON THE FILING OF SUCH DISMISSAL. D306 551-3846

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR FEB-23-2012 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 306

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-09-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-23-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 218. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-23-2011 - BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-23-2011 AT 3:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 611. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-11-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAR-25-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOSNY, MOHAMED M. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: OFIERSKI, RAFAL SUBSTITUTED FOR BAUMGARTNER MARGARET W AS ATTORNEY FOR CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOSNY, MOHAMED M. AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY DOES 1 THRU 5, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-25-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-21-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-10-2011 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard M. Rogers