This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/30/2020 at 01:39:05 (UTC).

MIXPANEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. 405 HOWARD STREET SF LLC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 MIXPANEL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 405 HOWARD STREET SF LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7363

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIXPANEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

KNOTEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DOES 1-25

405 HOWARD STREET SF LLC, DOING BUSINESS AS KNOTEL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCONNELL, THOMAS SCOTT

Attorney at A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

1331 N. California Blvd, Fifth Floor,Po Box 8177

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIXPANEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT 405 HOWARD STREET SF LLC, DOING BUSINESS AS KNOTEL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KNOTEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION DOES 1-25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-07-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-28-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-15-2021

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1120A29F011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIXPANEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT 405 HOWARD STREET SF LLC, DOING BUSINESS AS KNOTEL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY KNOTEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION DOES 1-25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-07-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-28-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-15-2021 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7363
Case Title:MIXPANEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. 405 HOWARD STREET SF LLC, ET AL
Court Date:DEC-15-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Application And Hearing For Right To Attach Order
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for December 15, 2020 line 2.PLAINTIFF MIXPANEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION Notice Of Application And Hearing For Right To Attach Order - To Knotel, Incis continued to December 17, 2020. Opposing party is ordered to comply with SFLR 2.7B and provide a courtesy copy of opposition to department 501 no later than 8:00 a.m. on December 16, 2020 with a cover letter reflecting new hearing date. =(501/CFH)


Case Number:*******7363
Case Title:MIXPANEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. 405 HOWARD STREET SF LLC, ET AL
Court Date:DEC-17-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Application And Hearing For Right To Attach Order - To Knotel, Inc
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for December 17, 2020 line 15.PLAINTIFF MIXPANEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION Notice Of Application And Hearing For Right To Attach Order - To Knotel, Incis GRANTED as requested. =(501/CFH)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIXPANEL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KNOTEL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCONNELL, THOMAS S.