This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:31:11 (UTC).

MITCHELL LEIGH et al VS. A.W.CHESTERON COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2007 MITCHELL LEIGH filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERON COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4404

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

ASSOCIATED PIPING & ENGINEERING CORP.

HOBBS BANNERMAN ENGINEERING, INC.

DOES 1-800

CRANE CO.

BIGGE CRANE AND RIGGING CO. ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS BIGGE GROUP

SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA

A.W.CHESTERON COMPANY

DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC.

UNOCAL CORPORATION FKA UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

SESSLER INC FKA P&W SALVAGE INC AND SESSLER CORPORATION INC

THE INDUSTRIAL MAINTENANCE ENGINEERING CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC., DBA TIMEC

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

ALEX ROBERTSON COMPANY

METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP INC.

PROCON INCORPORATED

SANTA FE BRAUN INC., AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CF BRAUN & CO.

J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

SANTA FE BRAUN, INC, AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO C.F. BRAUN, INC.

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

BERRY, PHILLIP SAMUEL

Attorney at BERRY AND BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue

Oakland,, CA 94610

SOFEN, ESQ., RONALD S.

Attorney at GIBBS, GIDEN, LOCHER & TURNER LLP

1880 Century Park East, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1621

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY

Attorney at COOLEY, MANION, JONES, HAKE & KUROWSKI LLP

201 Spear Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

BRUNI, CHRISTOPHE B.

Attorney at SINUNU BRUNI,LLP

333 Pine Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

ROSENDIN, JOANNE

Attorney at SACK ROSENDIN, LLP

One Kaiser Plaza, Suite 340

Oakland, CA 94612

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, 4Th Floor, P.O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

RHOADES, RALPH

Attorney at PARTON SELL

750 Lindaro Street, Suite 140

San Rafael, CA 94901

HANLEY, DEAN A

Attorney at PAUL HANLEY & HARLEY LLP

1608 Fourth Street, Suite 300

Berkeley, CA 94710

VIRJI, ARIF

WOO, RHONDA L

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue

Oakland, CA 94610

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO NOTICE DEPOSITION, TO SERVE NOTICE EARLY AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL LEIGH TO EIGHT HOURS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO NOTICE DEPOSITION, TO SERVE NOTICE EARLY AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL LEIGH TO EIGHT HOURS (TRANSACTION ID # 16680543) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16812534) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Defendant Scott Co. of Californias Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17098465) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF YOUNG S. LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS??? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING AND SERVICE OF MOTION FOR PREFERENCE IN TRIAL SETTING

DECLARATION OF YOUNG S. LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING AND SERVICE OF MOTION FOR PREFERENCE IN TRIAL SETTING (TRANSACTION ID # 17465565) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS (TRANSACTION ID # 17638075) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED PIPING & ENGINEERING CORP.

Notice of Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories Propounded by Defendant Parsons Infrastructure & Technology Group Inc. on Plaintiffs Mitchell Leigh and Ruth Leigh and for Award of Monetary Sanctions; Points & Authorities; Declaration of Christopher J. Dyas

NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY DEFENDANT PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE TECHNOLOGY GROUP INC. ON PLAINTIFFS MITCHELL LEIGH AND RUTH LEIGH AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS; POINTS AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER J. DYAS (TRANSACTION ID # 17711652) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP INC. HEARING SET FOR FEB-01-2008 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610 (Fee:40.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO THE DEFENDANT, J.T. THORPE & SON, INC., ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18401882) AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

Declaration of Christopher J. Dyas in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories Propounded by Defendant Parsons Infrastructure & Technology Group Inc. on Plaintiffs Mitchell Leigh and Ruth Leigh and for Award of Monetary Sanctions

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER J. DYAS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY DEFENDANT PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE TECHNOLOGY GROUP INC. ON PLAINTIFFS MITCHELL LEIGH AND RUTH LEIGH AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 19175706) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP INC.

Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 23197107) FILED BY ATTORNEY KANNETT, MARK SIMON

DECLARATION OF YOUNG S. LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO NOTICE DEPOSITION AND TO SERVE NOTICE EARLY AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL LEIGH TO EIGHT HOURS

DECLARATION OF YOUNG S. LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO NOTICE DEPOSITION AND TO SERVE NOTICE EARLY AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL LEIGH TO EIGHT HOURS (TRANSACTION ID # 16615294) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH

PLAINTIFFS??? NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL LEIGH TO EIGHT HOURS

NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL LEIGH TO EIGHT HOURS (TRANSACTION ID # 16660806) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH HEARING SET FOR OCT-22-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 610 (Fee:40.00)

DEFENDANT J.T.THORPE & SON, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM-ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16673808) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS ANWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16735899) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF YOUNG S. LEE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF YOUNG S. LEE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17614787) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH

DECLARATION OF PAUL S. LECKY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF PAUL S. LECKY IN SUPPORT OF MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS (TRANSACTION ID # 17638075) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED PIPING & ENGINEERING CORP.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE ON NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL (TRANSACTION ID # 17711652) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 19175706) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP INC.

Substitution of Attorney - Civil

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 21936693): HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY SUBSTITUTED FOR HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY AS ATTORNEY FOR A.W.CHESTERON COMPANY

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2010
  • ASBESTOS DISCOVERY, 220, DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO PROVIDE DISCOVERY RESPONSES; AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS. OFF CALENDAR, AT THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ; ENTIRE ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 29022698)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL (TRANSACTION ID # 28343861) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MELISSA M. CORICA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO PROVIDE DISCOVERY RESPONSES; AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 28343861) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL (TRANSACTION ID # 28343861) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO PROVIDE DISCOVERY RESPONSES; AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 28343861) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR JAN-27-2010 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 220 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27174254) AS TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 23197107) FILED BY ATTORNEY KANNETT, MARK SIMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 22766579) FILED BY ATTORNEY GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2008
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON OCT-15-2008 - OFF CALENDAR. JUDGE: A. JAMES ROBERTSON, II; CLERK: ERNALYN BURA; REPORTER: SUSAN LEE CSR# 4280 (D206)

    Read MoreRead Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 16660806) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL LEIGH TO EIGHT HOURS (TRANSACTION ID # 16660806) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH HEARING SET FOR OCT-22-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 610 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SHOTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO BE HEARD ON 10/22/07 AT 9:00 A.M. IN DEPT. 610. OPPOSITION DUE 10/18 BY 4 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF YOUNG S. LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO NOTICE DEPOSITION AND TO SERVE NOTICE EARLY AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL LEIGH TO EIGHT HOURS (TRANSACTION ID # 16615294) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME (TRANSACTION ID # 16615294) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO NOTICE DEPOSITION, TO SERVE NOTICE EARLY AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITING DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL LEIGH TO EIGHT HOURS (TRANSACTION ID # 16615294) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16604691) FILED BY DEFENDANT BIGGE CRANE AND RIGGING CO. ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS BIGGE GROUP (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEIGH, MITCHELL LEIGH, RUTH AS TO DEFENDANT A.W.CHESTERON COMPANY ASBESTOS CORPORATION,LTD., ASSOCIATED PIPING & ENGINEERING CORP. ALEX ROBERTSON COMPANY DOES 1-800 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS-SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-15-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less