Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:52:39 (UTC).

MIN MIN PHYO et al VS. AMIT KUMAR BARMAN et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 MIN MIN PHYO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMIT KUMAR BARMAN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3076

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PHYO, MIN MIN

Daly City, CA 94015

MYINT, MOE

Daly City, CA 94015

Defendants

ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR

600 Corporate Park Drive

St.Louis, MO 63105

BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR

Santa Clara, CA 95051

RENTAL INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

600 Corporate Park

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY PLAINTIFF PHYO, MIN MIN AS TO DEFENDANT ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF PHYO, MIN MIN MYINT, MOE RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR $10,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $95.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,095.00, DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AGAINST RENTAL INSURANCE SERVICE INC. IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FOR PLAINTIFF MIN MIN PHYO= $1,800.00 AND FOR PLAINTIFF MOE MYINT = $8,200.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAY-28-2013 - CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS AMIT BARMAN AND ENTERPRISES RENT A CAR TO JUL-30-2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 506. APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES, EXCEPT AMIT BARMAN AND ENTERPRISES RENT A CAR. DEFENDANT WAS REPRESENTED BY ANDREW BENDOR--ADJUSTER. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

AUTO ACCIDENT CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY PHYO, MIN MIN MYINT, MOE AS TO DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-22-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON AMENDED CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF -SIGNED SERVED JUL-05-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

AMENDED AUTO ACCIDENT CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY PHYO, MIN MIN MYINT, MOE AS TO DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR RENTAL INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON AMENDED CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - SIGNED - ON AMENDED CLAIM SERVED MAR-22-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT RENTAL INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF PHYO, MIN MIN MYINT, MOE RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR $10,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $95.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,095.00, DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AGAINST RENTAL INSURANCE SERVICE INC. IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FOR PLAINTIFF MIN MIN PHYO= $1,800.00 AND FOR PLAINTIFF MOE MYINT = $8,200.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF JUL-30-2013 - JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO RENTAL INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. BY COURT AT SMALL CLAIM HEARING OF JUL-30-2013 AT 1:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF JUL-30-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF JUL-30-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL. APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES EXCEPT RENTAL INS. SERVICE INC. AND ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR. DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE AND AMENDED CLAIM WAS FILED AGAINST DEFENDANT ENTERPRISE ON THE SAME DAY 3/19/13. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON AMENDED CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF -SIGNED SERVED JUL-05-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • DECLARATION OF DF ADDRESS UPDATE FILED BY PLAINTIFF PHYO, MIN MIN MYINT, MOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF PHYO, MIN MIN MYINT, MOE AS TO DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAY-28-2013 - CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS AMIT BARMAN AND ENTERPRISES RENT A CAR TO JUL-30-2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 506. APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES, EXCEPT AMIT BARMAN AND ENTERPRISES RENT A CAR. DEFENDANT WAS REPRESENTED BY ANDREW BENDOR--ADJUSTER. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON AMENDED CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - SIGNED - ON AMENDED CLAIM SERVED MAR-22-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT RENTAL INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF PHYO, MIN MIN MYINT, MOE AS TO DEFENDANT RENTAL INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED AUTO ACCIDENT CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY PHYO, MIN MIN MYINT, MOE AS TO DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR RENTAL INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • TRIAL RESET TO MAY-28-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF MAR-22-2013 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY PLAINTIFF PHYO, MIN MIN AS TO DEFENDANT ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • RETURNED MAIL: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM (CERT MAIL) MAILED 2/05/2013 TO AMIT KUMAR BARMAN - UNCLAIMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-07-2012, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF PHYO, MIN MIN MYINT, MOE AS TO DEFENDANT ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF PHYO, MIN MIN MYINT, MOE AS TO DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTO ACCIDENT CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY PHYO, MIN MIN MYINT, MOE AS TO DEFENDANT BARMAN, AMIT KUMAR ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-22-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

    Read MoreRead Less