This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 10:51:03 (UTC).

MILTON MARTINEZ VS. VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 MILTON MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, ANGELA BRADSTREET, GARRETT L. WONG, RICHARD B. ULMER and ETHAN P. SCHULMAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4208

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

ANGELA BRADSTREET

GARRETT L. WONG

RICHARD B. ULMER

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ, MILTON

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 25

FEDEX CORPORATION

VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC.

FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LADVA, ASHWIN V.

Attorney at LADVA LAW FIRM

530 Jackson Street,, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorneys

KESTEN, STEVEN MARK

Attorney at KENSTEN-LAW

101 Lucas Valley Rd. Suite 273

San Rafael, CA 94903

CODY, BRANDY T.

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

111 Sw Fifth Avenue, Ste 4040

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

Notice of Motion for Summary Adjudication

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT /NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100063814) FILED BY DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAY-28-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Plaintiffs Reply to Defendant FEDEX Ground Package System, Inc. Opposi

REPLY TO DEFENDANT FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC. OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 100068213) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON

Separate Statement in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Furthe

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 63127697) FILED BY DEFENDANT FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.

Declaration of Anthony E. Guzman II in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion

DECLARATION OF ANTHONY E. GUZMAN II IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 63127697) FILED BY DEFENDANT FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.

Declaration of William R.H. Mosher in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion

DECLARATION OF WILLIAM R.H. MOSHER IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 63127697) FILED BY DEFENDANT FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.

Memorandum of PA in Support of Motion to Compel

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES (TRANSACTION ID # 100066254) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON

Plaintiffs Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES (TRANSACTION ID # 100066254) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON

Declaration of Jacqueline Oh

DECLARATION OF JACQUELINE OH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES (TRANSACTION ID # 100066254) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON

Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Defendants Further Di

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES (TRANSACTION ID # 100066254) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON HEARING SET FOR APR-15-2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100063814) FILED BY DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040788) FILED BY DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

CMC Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62161865) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.s Answer and Affirmative De

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100038680) FILED BY DEFENDANT FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER (TRANSACTION ID # 18100010) FILED BY DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC.

Answer to First Amended Complaint

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18100010) FILED BY DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED AMENDED TO PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON

PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61793029), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON SERVED MAR-05-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B9519509C003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1419319M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B9519227R002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B9519227M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5218C13M026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : Y0118605F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R9218412F010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0818209F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - CONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100073274) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. THIS MATTER IS OFF CALENDAR AT THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY PER EMAIL DATED MAY 20, 2019. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER, CLERK: E. LARNAUTI, REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR 8600 (EMAIL: MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM) (302/RBU)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62161865) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100038680) FILED BY DEFENDANT FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61911294), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON SERVED APR-10-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER (TRANSACTION ID # 18100010) FILED BY DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18100010) FILED BY DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AMENDED TO PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61847538) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON AS TO DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC. FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61793029), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON SERVED MAR-05-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, MILTON AS TO DEFENDANT VISTA DEL MAR LOGISTICS, INC. FEDEX CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-11-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-10-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDEX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cody, Brandy T