This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/16/2016 at 04:47:17 (UTC).

MILLER FREEMAN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. vs. BIOVISION A FICTITIOUS FIRM et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2001 MILLER FREEMAN, INC A CALIFORNIA CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BIOVISION A FICTITIOUS FIRM. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7869

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER FREEMAN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100

BIOVISION A FICTITIOUS FIRM

PHILLIPS, JARROD IND/DBA BIOVISION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEALD, DANIEL A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2001
  • DocketOSC CALENDAR OF DEC-26-2001, OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2001
  • DocketOSC CALENDAR OF NOV-14-2001, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE POS AND OBTAIN ANSWER FROM OR ENTER DEFAULT. OSC TO PLTF'S ATTY DANIEL A HEALD. HEARING SET FOR DEC-26-2001 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 212 NOTICE SENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • DocketOSC CALENDAR OF OCT-03-2001, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO SERVE DEFENDANT AND FILE PROOF OF SERVICE WITHIN 60 DAYS OF FILING OF COMPLAINT, TO OBTAIN ANSWER OR ENTER DEFAULT. OSC TO PLTF'S ATTY DANIEL HEALD. HEARING SET FOR NOV-14-2001 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 212 NOTICE SENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2001
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF AUG-24-2001, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO SERVE DEFENDANT AND FILE PROOF OF SERVICE WITHIN 60 DAYS OF FILING OF COMPLAINT, TO OBTAIN ANSWER OR ENTER DEFAULT. OSC TO PLTF'S ATTY DANIEL HEALD. HEARING SET FOR OCT-03-2001 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 212 NOTICE SENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2001
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OSC CALENDAR OF JUL-24-2001, OFF CALENDAR JULY 24,2001 POS OSC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2001
  • DocketADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR JUL-24-2001 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 212

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2001
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2001
  • DocketCOMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILLER FREEMAN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. AS TO DEFENDANT BIOVISION A FICTITIOUS FIRM PHILLIPS, JARROD IND/DBA BIOVISION DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-24-2001 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-25-2001 STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-06-2001 (Fee:101.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less