Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 12:12:38 (UTC).

MIKE MCKEE VS. YVONNE LANE

Case Summary

On 02/20/2014 MIKE MCKEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against YVONNE LANE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0970

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCKEE, MIKE

San Francisco, CA 94124

Respondent

LANE, YVONNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KIM, JENNIFER J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2014
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD: KIM, JENNIFER J. WITHDRAWN AS ATTORNEY FOR MCKEE, MIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS SEP-19-2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) - I&E NOT ATTACHED AS INDICATED, FILED SEPARATELY ON 3/14/14 AS TO RESPONDENT LANE, YVONNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED SUBMITTED BY: ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • PRELIMINARY FINAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER MCKEE, MIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: MAR-07-2014, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE: MAR-10-2014 FILED BY PETITIONER MCKEE, MIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MCKEE, MIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER MCKEE, MIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PETITIONER MCKEE, MIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER MCKEE, MIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER MCKEE, MIKE AS TO RESPONDENT LANE, YVONNE SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less